In Re Debtor Yan Sui

Appellant: Yan Sui
Trustee: Richard A. Marshack
Case Number: 8:2018cv02291
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Re: Objection #9 . Appellants' Objection is filed in and denied. (vdr)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to Order #8 Denying Motion filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (vdr)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT plaintiff's Motion #6 is denied. (vdr)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 REFERRAL OF MOTION to Disqualify Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald has been filed. Pursuant to GO 16-05 and Local Rule 72-5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald #6 is referred to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for determination. (rn)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 APPELLANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify District Judge Based On Personal Knowledge of Factual Matter and Bias filed by Appellant Yan Sui. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 APPELLANTS' CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND NOTICE OF RELATED CASES filed by Appellant Yan Sui. (iv)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellant Yan Sui Re: Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for Setoff entered on 12/4/2018 by Bankruptcy Judge Catherine Bauer, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/4/2018. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:11-bk-20448, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket) (jtil)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/26/2018. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Debtor Yan Sui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Yan Sui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Richard A. Marshack
Represented By: D Edward Hays
Represented By: Jess Robert Bressi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?