Paula Hinojosa v. Vianev Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paula Hinojosa
Defendant: DOES 1-10, UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc., Vianev Inc. dba The UPS Store #0015, Vianev Inc. and Vianev Inc. doing business as The UPS Store No. 0015
Case Number: 8:2018cv02298
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY in support First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Paula Hinojosa. (Graham, Anthony)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 4/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file their Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report,with the completed Exhibit A, by 4/1/2019. (kt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Benjamin J. Fox in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fox, Benjamin)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Downs, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Koltun, Gregory)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 (IN CHAMBERS) The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES thye Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration #7 , previously scheduled for 2/11/2019 at 1:30 pm, to MONDAY, 2/25/2019 at 1:30 pm before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #7 and to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.. (Koltun, Gregory)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Paula Hinojosa. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Graham, Anthony)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON UPSS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION TO 2/11/2019 #9 by Judge James V. Selna that the hearing on Defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.'s MOTION to Compel Arbitration #7 for 2/4/2019, shall be continued to 2/11/2019 at 01:30 PM. Defendant UPS may file a reply in support of its motion on or before 1/28/2019. (jp)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on UPS' Motion to Compel Arbitration from February 4, 2019 to February 11, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #7 filed by Defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fox, Benjamin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #7 filed by Plaintiff Paula Hinojosa. (Graham, Anthony)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/4/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Maddy Mullin, #3 Declaration Paige Basar) (Koltun, Gregory)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on 1/2/19 and 1/3/19. (Koltun, Gregory)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
December 28, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc., Vianev Inc., filed by plaintiff Paula Hinojosa. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/26/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A, PAGE 8) (ghap)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certificate as to Interested Parties filed by Defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc. identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Koltun, Gregory)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.. (Koltun, Gregory)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01033802-CU-BT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-22967963 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Declaration of George Downs) (Attorney Gregory B Koltun added to party UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Koltun, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paula Hinojosa v. Vianev Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Expedited Mail Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory B Koltun
Represented By: Benjamin J Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vianev Inc. dba The UPS Store #0015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vianev Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vianev Inc. doing business as The UPS Store No. 0015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Hinojosa
Represented By: Anthony G Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?