Soon Ja Song v. Red Robin International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: SOON JA SONG
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, LA HABRA ASSOCIATES, LLC and RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00049
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Soon Ja Song. (Kim, Jason)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to La Habra Associates, LLC answer now due 3/29/2019, filed by Defendant La Habra Associates, LLC.(Attorney Alison K Beanum added to party La Habra Associates, LLC(pty:dft))(Beanum, Alison)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Red Robin International, Inc. answer now due 3/29/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Red Robin International, Inc..(Attorney Erin Jillian Price added to party Red Robin International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Price, Erin)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (mku)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Discovery cut-off 11/5/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 8:30 a.m. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (mku)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on February 11, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. [SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS] (es)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant La Habra Associates, LLC, Red Robin International, Inc. (lh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SOON JA SONG, (Kim, Jason)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SOON JA SONG. (Kim, Jason)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SOON JA SONG. (Kim, Jason)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23014401 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SOON JA SONG. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party SOON JA SONG(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soon Ja Song v. Red Robin International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA HABRA ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Alison K Beanum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Erin Jillian Price
Represented By: Alden J Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOON JA SONG
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?