Grace Cho v. Nutritional Sport Supplements, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Grace Cho
Defendant: NUTRITIONAL SPORT SUPPLEMENTS, INC., DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, TRICO-TCH II, LTD. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00063
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: David O Carter
1 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Trico-Tch II, Ltd. answer now due 3/29/2019, filed by Defendant Trico-Tch II, Ltd..(Attorney David E Karlin added to party Trico-Tch II, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Karlin, David)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Nutritional Sport Supplements, Inc., Trico-Tch II, Ltd.. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Grace Cho, (Hong, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Grace Cho, (Hong, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Grace Cho. (Hong, Kevin)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23024388 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Grace Cho. (Attorney Kevin Hyunjong Hong added to party Grace Cho(pty:pla))(Hong, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grace Cho v. Nutritional Sport Supplements, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTRITIONAL SPORT SUPPLEMENTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRICO-TCH II, LTD.
Represented By: Larry Scott Karlin
Represented By: David E Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Cho
Represented By: Kevin Hyunjong Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?