Lindsey Alana Spray v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Lindsey Alana Spray
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 8:2019cv00094
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Dale S Fischer
1 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Lindsey Alana Spray. (Leland, Judith)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lindsey Alana Spray, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leland, Judith)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SHERI PYM [SOCIAL SECURITY]: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM SIMILAR ORDERS BY OTHER JUDGES: Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint and a copy of this order on defendant in the manner required by Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file a proof of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 30 days of the date of this order. Defendants counsel shall file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the summons and complaint. Defendant shall electronically serve on plaintiff a complete copy of the administrative record within 90 days of the service of the complaint (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (et)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lindsey Alana Spray. (Leland, Judith)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lindsey Alana Spray. (Leland, Judith)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lindsey Alana Spray, identifying Lindsey Alana Spray. (Leland, Judith)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23067303 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lindsey Alana Spray. (Attorney Judith S Leland added to party Lindsey Alana Spray(pty:pla))(Leland, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey Alana Spray v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Alana Spray
Represented By: Judith S Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?