Mariano Benitez v. Powerline Funding, LLC

Plaintiff: Mariano Benitez
Defendant: Powerline Funding, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00098
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
1 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thakor, Neil)
March 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton that: (1) Defendant Powerline Funding LLC shall have up to and including 4/15/2019 to file its response to the Complaint #21 . (jp)
March 14, 2019 Filing 21 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 15, 2019 filed by Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ritchie, Alan)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT #17 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Defendant POWERLINE FUNDING LLC may file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 3/18/2019. (jp)
March 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alan M Ritchie on behalf of Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC (Attorney Alan M Ritchie added to party Powerline Funding, LLC(pty:dft))(Ritchie, Alan)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC is to file its response to the Complaint no later than 3/18/2019 #17 . (jp)
March 4, 2019 Filing 17 Second STIPULATION to Continue Dealine for Defendant to File Response to Complaint from March 7, 2019 to March 18, 2019 Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thakor, Neil)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC shall have up to and including 3/7/2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #13 . (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #6 Non-Resident Attorney Taylor T Smith APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariano Benitez, designating Aaron D Aftergood as local counsel. (jp)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #5 Non-Resident Attorney Steven L Woodrow APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariano Benitez, designating Aaron D Aftergood as local counsel. (jp)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Motion for Class Certification filed by Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thakor, Neil)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC, (Thakor, Neil)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Neil Thakor on behalf of Defendant Powerline Funding, LLC (Attorney Neil Thakor added to party Powerline Funding, LLC(pty:dft))(Thakor, Neil)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Powerline Funding, LLC. (esa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
January 21, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Taylor T. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariano Benitez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23072573) filed by Plaintiff Mariano Benitez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Aftergood, Aaron)
January 21, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven L. Woodrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mariano Benitez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23072570) filed by Plaintiff Mariano Benitez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Aftergood, Aaron)
January 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mariano Benitez, identifying Woodrow & Peluso, LLC; Aaron D. Aftergood. (Aftergood, Aaron)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mariano Benitez. (Aftergood, Aaron)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mariano Benitez. (Aftergood, Aaron)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23072556 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mariano Benitez. (Attorney Aaron D Aftergood added to party Mariano Benitez(pty:pla))(Aftergood, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mariano Benitez v. Powerline Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerline Funding, LLC
Represented By: Neil Thakor
Represented By: Alan M Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Benitez
Represented By: Aaron D Aftergood
Represented By: Taylor T Smith
Represented By: Steven L Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?