Jake Carmack v. The 7M EGroup Corp.

Plaintiff: Jake Carmack
Defendant: The 7M EGroup Corp.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00099
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #10 is hereby STRICKEN AND VACATED as it was issued in error. The Court will issue a separate order setting a Scheduling Conference in this matter. (es)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [STRICKEN AND VACATED SEE DOCKET ENTRY #11 ] MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on March 4, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] (es) Modified on 2/11/2019 (es).
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jake Carmack, (Hedin, Frank)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Complaint #1 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the document is accepted as filed. However, counsel must consult the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #7 and file a Notice of Interested Parties no later than **January 29, 2019.** Failure to do so may result sanctions and/or the action being DISMISSED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The 7M EGroup Corp. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jake Carmack. (Hedin, Frank)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jake Carmack. (Hedin, Frank)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23072653 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jake Carmack. (Attorney Frank S Hedin added to party Jake Carmack(pty:pla))(Hedin, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jake Carmack v. The 7M EGroup Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 7M EGroup Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Carmack
Represented By: Frank S Hedin
Represented By: David William Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?