Martha Morrison v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Martha Morrison
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Does 2 to 20 and Doe
Case Number: 8:2019cv00144
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 5/17/2019 at 10:30 AM. See document for details. (tg)
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #12 with JURY DEMAND Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporations Answer To Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Attorney Susan Koehler Sullivan added to party Liberty Insurance Corporation(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Susan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Martha Morrison. Re Dismissal of Defendant, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Gersten, Sally)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 Proof of Service and NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Martha Morrison, upon Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Gretchen S. Carner, Esq, Attorney for Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Gersten, Sally)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint #12 as to Defendant Liberty Insurance Corporation. (jp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Stipulation to Amend/Correct, Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #10 , Order,, Order Extending Answer Due Deadline,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #11 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #14 , Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #12 filed by Plaintiff Martha Morrison. (Gersten, Sally)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #13 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please indicate "as to SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT" right after SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Stipulation to Amend/Correct, Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #10 , Order,, Order Extending Answer Due Deadline,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #11 , Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #12 filed by Plaintiff Martha Morrison. (Gersten, Sally)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Martha Morrison amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Martha Morrison (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Decl Page Policy, #2 Exhibit #2 - Condo Policy, #3 Exhibit #3 - CA Provisions, #4 Exhibit Repl Cost Endsmt, #5 Exhibit Mold Endsmt, #6 Exhibit 9-20-17 Estimate, #7 Exhibit 9-30-17 Estimate, #8 Exhibit Alpha's Estimate, #9 Exhibit 1-23-18 email, #10 Exhibit 2-23-18 email, #11 Exhibit Liberty website posting, #12 Exhibit 10-26-17 email, #13 Exhibit 10-31-17 email, #14 Exhibit 11-3-17 email, #15 Exhibit 3-9-18 email from atty, #16 Exhibit 3-9-18 email to atty, #17 Exhibit 12-1-17 Denial ltr sent 3-9-18, #18 Exhibit Website post w/o 12-1 letter, #19 Exhibit 10-11-17 email, #20 Exhibit 10-17-17 Accurate report, #21 Exhibit 7-19-18 Accurate report)(Gersten, Sally)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON PARTIES' STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TIME TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #10 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff may file her Second Amended Complaint on or before February 19, 2019; and 2. Defendant shall have until March 19, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (mrgo)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Susan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on 01/30/2019. (Sullivan, Susan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
January 25, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 20, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Martha Morrison. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 Defendant's Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff served on 01/25/2019. (Sullivan, Susan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Susan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties [F.R.C.P. 7.1; Local Rule 7.1-1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, identifying Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company. (Sullivan, Susan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Sullivan, Susan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01012282 Receipt No: 0973-23100017 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Attorney Susan Koehler Sullivan added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martha Morrison v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Morrison
Represented By: Sally L Gersten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Koehler Sullivan
Represented By: Gretchen S Carner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Susan Koehler Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Represented By: Susan Koehler Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?