Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Eric Spitz et al

Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Defendant: Etaros Acturial Services, LLC, JTR, LLC, C2 Advisors, LLC, Traci M. Christian, C&C Marketing LLC, Eric Spitz, Aaron Kushner, Richard J. Covelli and C and C Marketing LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00299
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1337
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Etaros Acturial Services, LLC answer now due 5/20/2019; Traci M. Christian answer now due 5/20/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Etaros Acturial Services, LLC; Traci M. Christian.(Attorney Brandon J Witkow added to party Traci M. Christian(pty:dft), Attorney Brandon J Witkow added to party Etaros Acturial Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Witkow, Brandon)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. upon C and C Marketing LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019; C2 Advisors, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Richard J. Covelli. (Jacobson, Jordan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. upon JTR, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Richard J. Covelli. (Jacobson, Jordan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. upon Richard J. Covelli waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Richard J. Covelli. (Jacobson, Jordan)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Joel W. Ruderman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation, designating Charles E. Canter as local counsel. (yl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ERRATA TO WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR ETAROS ACTUARIAL SERVICES, LLC filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Jacobson, Jordan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ERRATA TO WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR TRACI M. CHRISTIAN filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Jacobson, Jordan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ERRATA TO WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR AARON KUSHNER filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Jacobson, Jordan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. upon Aaron Kushner waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Erinn M. Contreras. (Jacobson, Jordan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel W. Ruderman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel W. Ruderman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Charles E Canter added to party Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation(pty:pla)) (Canter, Charles)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. upon Etaros Acturial Services, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Brandon J. Witkow. (Jacobson, Jordan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. upon Traci M. Christian waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Brandon J. Witkow. (Jacobson, Jordan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Eric Spitz. (twdb)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. upon Eric Spitz waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Raphael Cung. (Jacobson, Jordan)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #7 filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Jacobson, Jordan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The caption should include the parties address. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Jacobson, Jordan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Jacobson, Jordan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Jacobson, Jordan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Plan Document), #2 Exhibit 2 (Investiment Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 (Trusteeship Agreement)) (Attorney Jordan E Jacobson added to party Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation(pty:pla))(Jacobson, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Eric Spitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etaros Acturial Services, LLC
Represented By: Brandon J Witkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JTR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C2 Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci M. Christian
Represented By: Brandon J Witkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&C Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Covelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C and C Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Represented By: Jordan E Jacobson
Represented By: Charles E Canter
Represented By: Mark Robert Snyder
Represented By: Joel W Ruderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?