Nehemiah Kong v. 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Defendant: 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2019cv00306
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Further ordered that this action is removed from the Courts active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 5/1/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carson, Chris)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 5/17/2019 at 10:30 AM. See document for details. (tg)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC, (Larson, Arnold)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC.(Attorney Arnold Douglas Larson added to party 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC(pty:dft))(Larson, Arnold)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process - JAY ALAN NEAL in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23220949 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehemiah Kong v. 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1933 North Placentia Avenue, LLC
Represented By: Arnold Douglas Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?