IN-N-OUT Burgers v. Puma North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: IN-N-OUT Burgers
Defendant: Puma North America, Inc. and Mike Cherman
Case Number: 8:2019cv00413
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 *NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT* ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #15 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The Court, HEREBY ORDERS that Defendants PUMA North America, Inc. and Mike Cherman shall have an extension of time to file their responses to Plaintiff's initial complaint, up to and including May 15, 2019. (es)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 05/15/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sganga, John)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mike Cherman answer now due 4/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers.(Sganga, John)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers, upon Defendant Mike Cherman served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Mastrostefano, SVP General Counsel of PUMA North America, Inc., as Authorized by Mike Cherman in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sganga, John)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Puma North America, Inc. answer now due 4/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers.(Sganga, John)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers, upon Defendant Puma North America, Inc. served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter Mastrostefano, SVP General Counsel of PUMA North America, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sganga, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mike Cherman. (ghap)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Puma North America, Inc. (ghap)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by IN-N-OUT Burgers. (Sganga, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers, (Sganga, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers. (Sganga, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers. (Sganga, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers. (Sganga, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23305439 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff IN-N-OUT Burgers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N-O) (Attorney John B Sganga, Jr added to party IN-N-OUT Burgers(pty:pla))(Sganga, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN-N-OUT Burgers v. Puma North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puma North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Cherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN-N-OUT Burgers
Represented By: John B Sganga, Jr
Represented By: Nicole Rossi Townes
Represented By: Brian C Horne
Represented By: Jacob R Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?