William James Shoop v. Orange County Sheriffs Department et al
Plaintiff: William James Shoop
Defendant: Sandra Hutchens, Samuel Okabe, Narineh Mehrabian, Ryan Dierckman, Adam Treanor, Jacob Bieker, Blake Blaney, William Beeman, Todd Spitzer, Justin Meneses, Emad Mitry, Joseph Fikejs, Kevin Navarro, Jeffery Jensen, Mike Few, Daniel Solis, Christopher Alex, Anthony Rackauckas, Orange County Sheriffs Department, Jason Owens, Donald Barnes and Eric Gummio
Case Number: 8:2019cv00547
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order PRESENTED BY Order and Judgment prepared by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim regarding the Complaint #1 . Proposed Order and Judgment forwarded to the District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for approval. (cw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff William James Shoop. (rn)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The federal claims in the complaint are ordered dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and the state law claims are ordered dismissed for lack of jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). Although unlikely that Plaintiff can allege an actionable claim given the reasons outlined above, he may have leave to amend the complaint since he is pro se. To do so, Plaintiff must file a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") on or before June 21, 2019. Failure to file a voluntary notice of dismissal or a FAC by that deadline may result in this action being dismissed involuntarily. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause #6 filed by Plaintiff William James Shoop (hr)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. For this reason, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by no later than April 26, 2019 why the Complaint should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Alternatively, Plaintiff may request voluntary dismissal of this action using the attached Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Form (CV-09). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Voluntarily dismissed actions do not count as strikes under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), which limits the total number of civil rights lawsuits that prisoners may file while incarcerated. Failure to file a voluntary notice of dismissal or a timely response to this order to show cause may result in this action being dismissed involuntarily. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); L.R. 41-1. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Voluntary Dismissal CV-009) (clee)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Consent CV-11) (clee)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #2 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $20.00 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (clee)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff William James Shoop. (esa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Christopher Alex(Deputy District Attorney OCDA, in individual capacity), Christopher Alex(Deputy District Attorney OCDA, in official capacity), Donald Barnes(Under-Sheriff County of Orange, in official capacity), Donald Barnes(Under-Sheriff County of Orange, in individual capacity), William Beeman(Investigator OCSD, in individual capacity), William Beeman(Investigator OCSD, in official capacity), Jacob Bieker(Deputy OCSD, in individual capacity), Jacob Bieker(Deputy OCSD, in official capacity), Blake Blaney(Deputy OCSD, in official capacity), Blake Blaney(Deputy OCSD, in individual capacity), Ryan Dierckman(Sergeant OCSD, in official capacity), Ryan Dierckman(Sergeant OCSD, in individual capacity), Mike Few(Sergeant OCSD, in official capacity), Mike Few(Sergeant OCSD, in individual capacity), Joseph Fikejs(Member OCSD, in official capacity), Joseph Fikejs(Member OCSD, in individual capacity), Eric Gummio(Deputy OCSD, in official capacity), Eric Gummio(Deputy OCSD, in individual capacity), Sandra Hutchens(Sheriff-Coroner, County of Orange, in individual capacity), Sandra Hutchens(Sheriff-Coroner, County of Orange, in official capacity), Jeffery Jensen(Investigator OCSD, in individual capacity), Jeffery Jensen(Investigator OCSD, in official capacity), Narineh Mehrabian(Investigator Assistant OCSD, in official capacity), Narineh Mehrabian(Investigator Assistant OCSD, in individual capacity), Justin Meneses(Member OCSD, in official capacity), Justin Meneses(Member OCSD, in individual capacity), Emad Mitry(Investigator OCSD, in official capacity), Emad Mitry(Investigator OCSD, in individual capacity), Kevin Navarro(Lieutenant OCSD, in official capacity), Kevin Navarro(Lieutenant OCSD, in individual capacity), Samuel Okabe(Member OCSD, in official capacity), Samuel Okabe(Member OCSD, in individual capacity), Orange County Sheriffs Department, Jason Owens(Member OCSD, in individual capacity), Jason Owens(Member OCSD, in official capacity), Anthony Rackauckas(District Attorney County of Orange, in individual capacity), Anthony Rackauckas(District Attorney County of Orange, in official capacity), Daniel Solis(Deputy OCSD, in individual capacity), Daniel Solis(Deputy OCSD, in official capacity), Todd Spitzer(District Attorney County of Orange, in official capacity), Todd Spitzer(District Attorney County of Orange, in individual capacity), Adam Treanor(Investigator OCSD, in official capacity), Adam Treanor(Investigator OCSD, in individual capacity) pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, filed by plaintiff William James Shoop. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William James Shoop v. Orange County Sheriffs Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Hutchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Okabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narineh Mehrabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Dierckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Treanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Bieker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Blaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Beeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Meneses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emad Mitry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Fikejs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Few
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Alex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Rackauckas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Gummio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William James Shoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?