Rivera v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Fred Rivera, Laura Rivera and Roberto Mas
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC, All Entities Unknown, Does 1 to 10 inclusive, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and All Persons or Entities Unknown
Case Number: 8:2019cv00551
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Fred Rivera amending Complaint - (Discovery), Amended Complaint/Petition #12 JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Fred Rivera(Tran, Ai)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint consistent with this Order, if desired, on or before July 3, 2019. If Plaintiff chooses to amend the FAC, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff join necessary parties to this action Laura Rivera Roberto Mas. (twdb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 6/17/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #14 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 6/17/2019 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #14 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC. (Rapkine, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #14 with Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Fred Rivera. (Tran, Ai)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC.. (Rapkine, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint #14 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-S to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Rapkine, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint) (Rapkine, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER VACATING Order to Show Cause #11 by Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Fred Rivera(Tran, Ai)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 [VACATED ON 4/25/2019 SEE DKT. #13] MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge David O. Carter: The Court hereby orders plaintiff (s) to show cause in writing no later than April 25, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See order for details.) (es) Modified on 4/25/2019 (dgo).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint #9 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff must file and serve a First Amended Complaint by April 19, 2019. (twdb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rapkine, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:18-cv-01834 DOC(DFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-00551 DOC(DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC. (Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.) Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-01834-DOC-DFM (Rapkine, Michael)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
March 21, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Fred Rivera in Orange County Superior Court on 1/22/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC, identifying Wells Fargo & Co.. (Rapkine, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC. (Rapkine, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01048979 Receipt No: 0973-23416636 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC. (Attorney Michael Rapkine added to party Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC(pty:dft))(Rapkine, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Entities Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons or Entities Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Rivera
Represented By: Ai Nhan Mina Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Rivera
Represented By: Ai Nhan Mina Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Mas
Represented By: Ai Nhan Mina Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?