Julie A. Paolino v. United Health Care Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julie A. Paolino
Defendant: United Health Care, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Health Care Services, Inc. and Does 1-10, inclusive
Interested Party: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 8:2019cv00557
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court GRANTS United's motion to compel arbitration. The Court STAYS all proceedings pending the outcome of arbitration. (See document for further details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (es)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES OF Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case, or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #7 held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Motion hearing held. The Court hears oral argument from the parties. The Court takes the Motion under submission. Order to issue. In light of the foregoing, the Court deems the Scheduling Conference MOOT. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Adam Obeid, Jihad Smaili; Attorneys for Defendant: Marissa Lyftogt. Courtroom Deputy: Melissa Kunig; Time in Court: 0:15. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (mku)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. NO. 7) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: For reasons of calendar management and judicial economy, the Court CONTINUES the scheduling conference as well as the hearing on Plaintiff's motion to dismiss from May 20, 2019 to June 3, 2019 at 9:00 am. (es)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc... (Lyftogt, Marissa)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #7 filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marissa L. Lyftogt, #2 Exhibit A)(Lyftogt, Marissa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings #7 filed by Plaintiff Julie A. Paolino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Julie Paolino)(Smaili, Jihad)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Denying Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference #8 (es)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from May 20, 2019 to at least 30 days after May 20, 2019 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #6 filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suder, Morgan)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Marissa L. Lyftogt, #3 Declaration of Susan A. Weedman, #4 Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 1-4, #6 Proposed Order) (Lyftogt, Marissa)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
March 21, 2019 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
March 21, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, United Health Care, United Health Care Services, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Julie A. Paolino. (Filed in state court 11/1/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Health Care Services, Inc., identifying United HealthCare Services, Inc. and 2.UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Health Care Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01029568-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23421058 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United Health Care Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Statement of Punitive Damages, #3 Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Other Pleadings, #5 Declaration of Sharon A. Stuckmayer, #6 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party United Health Care Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Suder, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julie A. Paolino v. United Health Care Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Marissa L Lyftogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Services, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Paolino
Represented By: Jihad M Smaili
Represented By: Adam Obeid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?