Theresa Brooke v. Apple Eight Hospitality Ownership, Inc.
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Defendant: Apple Eight Hospitality Ownership, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00629
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Strojnik, Peter)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 5/17/2019.) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (tg)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Apple Eight Hospitality Ownership, Inc. (lh)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke, (Strojnik, Peter)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23493991 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Attorney Peter Kristofer Strojnik added to party Theresa Brooke(pty:pla))(Strojnik, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theresa Brooke v. Apple Eight Hospitality Ownership, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Eight Hospitality Ownership, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Represented By: Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?