Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004 v. M Y Excalibur et al
Plaintiff: Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004
Defendant: M/Y EXCALIBUR, Holleran Michael, Excalibur 45 Corporation, Global Impact Group, Inc., National Small Business Alliance, Inc., Michael Holleran and M Y Excalibur
Case Number: 8:2019cv00684
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0953
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWERS OF CORPORATE DEFENDANTS #37 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the hearing on PLAINTIFF's Motion to Strike Answers of Corporate Defendants shall be and hereby is continued to 10:00 a.m. on September30, 2019. (es)
July 9, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Strike Answers of Corporate Defendants from September 9, 2019 to September 30, 2019 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadli #37 Certificate Proof of Service of Ex Parte Motion For Order Continuing Hearing Date For Motion To Strike Answers of Corporate Defendants documents served on 07/09/2019. (Weiss, Philip)
July 9, 2019 Filing 37 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Strike Answers of Corporate Defendants from September 9, 2019 to September 30, 2019 Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines, #34 filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Declaration of Philip E. Weiss in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Continuing Hearing Date for Motion to Strike Answers of Corporate Defendants], #2 Exhibit [Exhibit A to Declaration of Philip E. Weiss in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Continuing Hearing Date for Motion to Strike Answers of Corporate Defendants, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed Order Continuing Hearing Date for Motion to Strike Answers of Corporate Defendants]) (Weiss, Philip)
July 9, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order of sale re: Interlocutory Vessel Sale [Ex Parte Application for Interlocutory Vessel Sale and Authorization to Credit Bid] #35 Certificate of Service of Ex Parte Motion For Interlocutory Vessel Sale And Authorization To Credit Bid documents served on 07/09/2019. (Weiss, Philip)
July 9, 2019 Filing 35 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order of sale re: Interlocutory Vessel Sale [Ex Parte Application for Interlocutory Vessel Sale and Authorization to Credit Bid] filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Declaration of Philip E. Weiss in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Interlocutory Vessel Sale and Authorization to Credit Bid], #2 Exhibit [Exhibits A-D to Declaration of Philip E. Weiss in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Interlocutory Vessel Sale and Authorization to Credit Bid], #3 Declaration [Declaration of Ray Jones in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Interlocutory Vessel Sale and Authorization to Credit Bid], #4 Exhibit [Exhibits A to Declaration of Ray Jones in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Interlocutory Vessel Sale and Authorization to Credit Bid], #5 Proposed Order [Proposed Order Directing Vessel Sale]) (Weiss, Philip)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER REGARING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. 29) by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: For reasons of calendar management and judicial economy, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Corporate Defendants' Answer is CONTINUED to September 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (es)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, re Reply (Motion related),,, #32 Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Reply To Defendants' Opposition To Motion To Strike Answers of All Corporate Defendants And For Order Entering Their Defaults; Declaration of Tamara Geehan In Support; and [Proposed] Order Vacating Motion To Strike Answers of Defendants National Small Business Alliance, Inc. and Global Impact Group, Inc., and Requiring Defendant Excalibur 45 Corporation To File Proof Of Reinstatement Within 21 Days served on 07/03/2019. (Weiss, Philip)
July 3, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Strike Answers of All Corporate Defendants and For Order Entering Their Defaults] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Answer of All Corporate Defendants Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #26 #29 filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Declaration of Tamara A. Geehan in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Strike Answers of All Corporate Defendants and for Order Entering Their Defaults], #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Vacating Motion to Strike Answers of Defendants National Small Business Alliance, Inc. and Global Impact Group, Inc., and Requiring Defendant Excalibur 45 Corporation to File Proof of Reinstatement Within 21 Days])(Weiss, Philip)
July 1, 2019 Filing 31 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Answer of All Corporate Defendants Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #26 #29 filed by Defendants Excalibur 45 Corporation, Global Impact Group, Inc., Michael Holleran, M Y Excalibur, National Small Business Alliance, Inc.. (Weil, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Answer of All Corporate Defendants Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #26 #29 served on 06/14/2019. (Weiss, Philip)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Answer of All Corporate Defendants Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #26 filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum [Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answers of All Corporate Defendants and For Order Entering Their Defaults], #2 Declaration [Declaration of Philip E. Weiss In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answers of All Corporate Defendants and For Order Entering Their Defaults], #3 Exhibit [Exhibits A-C to Declaration of Philip E. Weiss In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answers of All Corporate Defendants and For Order Entering Their Defaults], #4 Proposed Order [Proposed Order Granting Motion for Order Striking Answer of Corporate Defendants and Entering Their Defaults]) (Weiss, Philip)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 Certification as to Interested Parties filed by Defendants Excalibur 45 Corporation, Global Impact Group, Inc., Michael Holleran, M Y Excalibur, National Small Business Alliance, Inc. (Weil, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
June 6, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Excalibur 45 Corporation, Global Impact Group, Inc., Michael Holleran, M Y Excalibur, National Small Business Alliance, Inc..(Attorney David Weil added to party Excalibur 45 Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David Weil added to party Global Impact Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Weil added to party Michael Holleran(pty:dft), Attorney David Weil added to party M Y Excalibur(pty:dft), Attorney David Weil added to party National Small Business Alliance, Inc.(pty:dft))(Weil, David)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than June 7, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default OR Answer. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (FRCivP 41). (es)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, upon Defendant Excalibur 45 Corporation served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Weil, Esq., Attorney for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Weiss, Philip)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, upon Defendant Global Impact Group, Inc. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Weil, Esq., Attorney for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Weiss, Philip)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, upon Defendant National Small Business Alliance, Inc. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Weil, Esq., Attorney for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Weiss, Philip)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, upon Defendant Michael Holleran served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Weil, Esq., Attorney for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Weiss, Philip)
May 6, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT OF RIGHT OR INTEREST IN VESSEL filed by Defendant Excalibur 45 Corporation (Weil, David)
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Excalibur 45 Corporation, Global Impact Group, Inc., Michael Holleran, M Y Excalibur, National Small Business Alliance, Inc. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 WARRANT IN REM as to "M/Y EXCALIBUR", U.S.C.G. Official Number 1057893 issued. (mba)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AUTHORIZING ARREST OF DEFENDANT VESSEL PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL ADMIRALTY RULE C by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re #5 . (mba)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN AND AUTHORIZING MOVEMENT OF DEFENDANT VESSEL by Magistrate Judge John D. Early re #6 . (mba)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #10 filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Weiss, Philip)
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Notice of Lodgment of Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian and Authorizing Movement of Defendant Vessel] re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian #6 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form,, #12 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian and Authorizing Movement of Defendant Vessel])(Weiss, Philip)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Notice of Lodgment of Proposed Order Authorizing Arrest of Defendant Vessel] re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form,, #12 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem as to Warrant for Vessel Arrest -- M/Y EXCALIBUR [Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Issuance of A Warrant for Arrest of Defendant Vessel] #5 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed Order Authorizing Arrest of Defendant Vessel Pursuant to Supplemental Admiralty Rule C])(Weiss, Philip)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: REQUEST for Issuance of Warrant in Rem as to Issuance of Warrant for Arrest in Action In Rem #7 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian #6 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem as to Warrant for Vessel Arrest -- M/Y EXCALIBUR [Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Issuance of A Warrant for Arrest of Defendant Vessel] #5 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Counsel is ordered to comply with Local Civil Rules, Rules 5-4.4.1, 5-4.4.2, 7-19, and 7-20 relating to proposed orders. See also Local Rules for Admiralty and Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, Rule A-A.1 and Rule C-C.3. (mba)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Issuance of Warrant in Rem as to Issuance of Warrant for Arrest in Action In Rem #7 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian #6 , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem as to Warrant for Vessel Arrest -- M/Y EXCALIBUR [Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Issuance of A Warrant for Arrest of Defendant Vessel] #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): A proposed Order was not submitted with the applications.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Remove "et al " from the Summons caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Warrant in Rem as to Issuance of Warrant for Arrest in Action In Rem filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Weiss, Philip)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Declaration of Steven H. Curran in Support of Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Substitute Custodian and For Authorization for Movement of Defendant Vessel]) (Weiss, Philip)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem as to Warrant for Vessel Arrest -- M/Y EXCALIBUR [Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Issuance of A Warrant for Arrest of Defendant Vessel] filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Attachments: #1 Declaration [Declaration of Philip E. Weiss in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Defendant Vessel]) (Weiss, Philip)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004, (Weiss, Philip)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Weiss, Philip)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Weiss, Philip)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23532018 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Exhibits A-1 through B to Verified Complaint]) (Attorney Philip E Weiss added to party Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004(pty:pla))(Weiss, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004 v. M Y Excalibur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y EXCALIBUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holleran Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excalibur 45 Corporation
Represented By: David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Impact Group, Inc.
Represented By: David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Small Business Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Holleran
Represented By: David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Y Excalibur
Represented By: David Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinaldi Family Trust Dated February 26, 2004
Represented By: Philip E Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?