Theo Lubbe v. Dealer Spike, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Theo Lubbe
Defendant: Dealer Spike, LLC and Mike Thompson Recreational Vehicles
Case Number: 8:2019cv00694
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement #16 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for thirty (30) days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe, upon Defendant Mike Thompson Recreational Vehicles served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chris Santa Maria, General manager of Mike Thompson Recreational Vehicles. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe, upon Defendant Dealer Spike, LLC served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Corporate Operations manager of Corporation Trust Company in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Mike Thompson Recreational Vehicles. (twdb)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dealer Spike, LLC. (ghap)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 2 filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2- Infringement)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Theo Lubbe. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe, (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23542259 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theo Lubbe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Theo Lubbe(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theo Lubbe v. Dealer Spike, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theo Lubbe
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealer Spike, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Thompson Recreational Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?