Jorge Valdes v. Harcourts International USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jorge Valdes
Defendant: Harcourts International USA, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00701
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Harcourts International USA, Inc..(Smigliani, Suzanne)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to set aside the entry of default. The July 1, 2019 hearing on Defendants motion is VACATED. Defendants shall have 30 days to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (See order for further details) (es)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 09:00 AM. (rrp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #23 . filed by Defendant Harcourts International USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities in support of Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, #2 Declaration of Joe Donnini in support of Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, #3 Declaration of Suzanne L. Smigliani in support of Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service) (Smigliani, Suzanne)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Harcourts International USA, Inc., identifying Harcourts International, Ltd. and IAG New Zealand Limited. (Attorney Suzanne L Smigliani added to party Harcourts International USA, Inc. (pty:dft))(Smigliani, Suzanne)
May 17, 2019 Filing 24 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION: On May 9 and May 14, 2019, the Court issued Orders to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution #19 and #21 . On May 15, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Clerk to Enter Default #22 . The Clerk entered default on 5/16/2019 #23 . In light of this responsive filing, the Court hereby orders the OSCs discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 16, 2019 Filing 23 *DEFAULT SET ASIDE BY COURT #28 * DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Harcourts International USA, Inc (es) Modified on 6/27/2019 (es).
May 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Harcourts International USA, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaufman, Rachel)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On May 9, 2019, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution #19 . On May 14, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Response to the Court's Order #20 and within the filing requested the Court to direct the Clerk to enter default against Defendant. If Plaintiff wishes to request entry of default against Defendant, Plaintiff must file a proper and formal request on the docket. The Court continues the deadline to the Order to Show Cause to May 24, 2019. (es)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdesto Order to Show Cause,, #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kaufman, Rachel)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than May 14, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default OR Answer, Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (FRCivP 41) (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (es)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes, designating Attorney Afshin Siman as local counsel. (es)
April 29, 2019 Filing 17 First APPLICATION to Amend First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23612998) #14 filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Siman, Afshin) Modified on 4/30/2019 (es).
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23612998) #14 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by May 3, 2019. (es)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23612998) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Other error(s) with document(s): NJ is out of date. (lt)
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 [STRICKEN SEE DOCKET ENTRY #16 ** First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan L. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23612998) filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Siman, Afshin) Modified on 4/26/2019 (es).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Avi R. Kaufman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jorge Valdes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, designating Afshin Siman as local counsel. (es)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes, upon Defendant Harcourts International USA, Inc. served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kaufman, Rachel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Avi R. Kaufman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23562968) filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Siman, Afshin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney on behalf of Plaintiff Jorge Valdes. RE: Response to Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am currently waiting the Certificates of Good Standing from New York and New Jersey. I will file the PHV motion as soon as I receive them. (lt)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jorge Valdes, (Kaufman, Rachel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): The Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. It should have been filed and entered separately under its proper event. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Coleman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Harcourts International USA, Inc. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:19-cv-00701-AG (DFMx). (et)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff JORGE VALDES. (Siman, Afshin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23544256 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff JORGE VALDES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Afshin Siman added to party JORGE VALDES(pty:pla))(Siman, Afshin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jorge Valdes v. Harcourts International USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harcourts International USA, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne L Smigliani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Valdes
Represented By: Afshin Siman
Represented By: Rachel Kaufman
Represented By: Stefan L Coleman
Represented By: Avi R Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?