Adam Ghadiri v. Rainbow 1, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Adam Ghadiri
Defendant: Rainbow Sandals, Inc., Does 1-10 and Rainbow 1, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00713
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Carson, Chris)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload 6/17/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (jp)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rrp)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (rrp)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Rainbow 1, LLC, Rainbow Sandals, Inc. (et)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Handy, Russell)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adam Ghadiri, (Handy, Russell)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Handy, Russell)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23556873 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Adam Ghadiri. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Adam Ghadiri(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adam Ghadiri v. Rainbow 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Sandals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Ghadiri
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?