Richard Elparin v. Alex M. Azar II
Plaintiff: Richard Elparin
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Case Number: 8:2019cv00788
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Alex M. Azar II.(Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Alex M. Azar II(pty:dft))(Beck, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:19-cv-00788 RSWL(KSx). (rn)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Elparin, upon Defendant Alex M. Azar II served on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to T. De La Rosa, Agent. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E. Sase, Agent. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Hugo V., Agent for Blue Shield of California. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Rus, Ronald)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar II. (et)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV11C- Statement of Consent) (et)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Richard Elparin. (Rus, Ronald)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Richard Elparin, identifying Richard Elparin, an individual; Alex M. Azar II, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services; Blue Shield of California. (Rus, Ronald)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Richard Elparin. (Rus, Ronald)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23640599 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Richard Elparin. (Attorney Ronald Rus added to party Richard Elparin(pty:pla))(Rus, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Elparin v. Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Elparin
Represented By: Ronald Rus
Represented By: Samuel Augustine Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?