United States of America v. Laxman Patel et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Laxman Patel, Hiten Patel, Jashu Patel and Anita Patel
Case Number: 8:2019cv00792
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) (1) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Stay; (2) VACATING Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 15); and (3) VACATING Scheduling Conference by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the Court ORDERS the parties to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be stayed pending the Ninth Circuit's disposition of the appeal in Boyd. The parties' responses may be no longer than five (5) pages in length. Further, the Court VACATES the hearing on Defendants Motion and the Scheduling Conference, both of which are currently set for 6/28/2019, at 10:30 AM. (jp)
June 8, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Anita Patel, Hiten Patel, Jashu Patel, Laxman Patel. (Michaels, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims to Reduce Penalty Assessments to Judgment #15 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Supplement RESPONSE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES OF MATERIAL FACT)(Briggs, Melissa)
May 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims to Reduce Penalty Assessments to Judgment filed by Defendants Anita Patel, Hiten Patel, Jashu Patel, Laxman Patel. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Supplement Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment, #4 Declaration Declaration of David Michaels, #5 Appendix Exhibit Index, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I) (Michaels, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Briggs, Melissa)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 6/28/2019 at 10:30 A.M. (tg)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV18-00238-JLS (JDEx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV19-00792-JLS (JDEx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (dv)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Anita Patel, Hiten Patel, Jashu Patel, Laxman Patel, (Michaels, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Anita Patel, Hiten Patel, Jashu Patel, Laxman Patel.(Attorney David T Michaels added to party Anita Patel(pty:dft), Attorney David T Michaels added to party Hiten Patel(pty:dft), Attorney David T Michaels added to party Jashu Patel(pty:dft), Attorney David T Michaels added to party Laxman Patel(pty:dft))(Michaels, David)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Anita Patel, Hiten Patel, Jashu Patel and Laxman Patel. (jtil)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-00238-JLS (Briggs, Melissa)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Briggs, Melissa)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Briggs, Melissa)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Melissa Briggs added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Briggs, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Laxman Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laxman Patel
Represented By: David T Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiten Patel
Represented By: David T Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jashu Patel
Represented By: David T Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Patel
Represented By: David T Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?