Rima Jones v. Kaiser Permanente
Plaintiff: Rima Jones, . and Rima Jones
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente
Case Number: 8:2019cv00845
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:18-cv-00294-CRS, from U.S. District Court Western District of Kentucky (Louisville). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 8:19-cv-00845-JLS-ADSx. (car)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Kentucky Western
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 5/1/2019. The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Central District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. Should further filings be filed in this Court, the Clerk of Court shall transfer the filings to the Central District of California. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (MEJ) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 3/6/2019 denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend as Moot. cc: Counsel, Pro se Plaintiff (RLJ) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re #9 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment) by Rima Jones, pro se. (JWM) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Permanente, filed by Rima Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons) (JM) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Rima Jones. (JM) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 11/29/2018 re #1 Complaint filed by Rima Jones. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days from the entry date of this Order (as set forth). Plaintiff is WARNED that her failure to file an amended complaint within the time allotted will result in dismissal of the action for failure to prosecute or for failure to comply with an order of this Court. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED (1) to send Plaintiff a "Complaint for a Civil Case" form and to write the instant case number and "Amended" in the caption; and (2) to send Plaintiff two summons forms. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (CDF) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 6 Response to #4 Notice of Deficiency (summons tendered) filed by Rima Jones. (KJA) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (EBOC) Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/20/2018 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Plaintiff (pro se) (JM) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Summons Not Tendered. Plaintiff is required to prepare a Summons to be served upon each defendant. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/20/2018. (KD) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. Magistrate Judge designation: Dave Whalin. (KD) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rima Jones. (KD) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaiser Permanente, filed by Rima Jones. (KD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2018: #1 Summons Tendered) (DAK). [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 5/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rima Jones v. Kaiser Permanente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rima Jones, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rima Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?