Wi-LAN Inc. et al v. Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Wi-LAN Inc., Wi LAN Labs, Inc. and Wi LAN USA, Inc.
Defendant: TCL Communication, Inc., TCL Mobile Communication Holdings Ltd., Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCT Mobile, Inc., TCL Communication Ltd., TCT Mobile International Ltd., TCL Corporation, TCT Mobile US Inc. and TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00870
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING PARTIES AND DEADLINES TO RESPOND #39 by Judge James V. Selna. The Joint Stipulation is GRANTED. The date for TCL Communication, Inc., TCT Mobile, Inc., TCT Mobile (U.S.) Inc., and TCT Mobile (US) Holdings, Inc. to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended up to and including September 18, 2019. The initial Scheduling Conference currently set for July 29, 2019 is rescheduled to September 23, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (es)
July 1, 2019 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 18, 2019 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armond, Michelle)
July 1, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Yun Louise Lu on behalf of Defendants Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd., TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Communication, Inc., TCL Corporation, TCL Mobile Communication Holdings Ltd., TCT Mobile International Ltd., TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc., TCT Mobile US Inc., TCT Mobile, Inc. (Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCL Communication Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCL Communication, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCL Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCL Mobile Communication Holdings Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCT Mobile International Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCT Mobile US Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Yun Louise Lu added to party TCT Mobile, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lu, Yun)
July 1, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John P Schnurer on behalf of Defendants Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd., TCL Communication Ltd., TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd., TCL Communication, Inc., TCL Corporation, TCL Mobile Communication Holdings Ltd., TCT Mobile International Ltd., TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc., TCT Mobile US Inc., TCT Mobile, Inc. (Attorney John P Schnurer added to party Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCL Communication Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCL Communication, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCL Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCL Mobile Communication Holdings Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCT Mobile International Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCT Mobile US Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney John P Schnurer added to party TCT Mobile, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schnurer, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TCT Mobile US Inc. answer now due 7/3/2019; TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc. answer now due 7/3/2019; TCT Mobile, Inc. answer now due 7/3/2019; TCL Communication, Inc. answer now due 7/3/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants TCT Mobile US Inc. ; TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc.; TCT Mobile, Inc.; TCL Communication, Inc..(Korniczky, Stephen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen S Korniczky on behalf of Defendants TCL Communication, Inc., TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc., TCT Mobile US Inc., TCT Mobile, Inc. (Attorney Stephen S Korniczky added to party TCL Communication, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen S Korniczky added to party TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen S Korniczky added to party TCT Mobile US Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Stephen S Korniczky added to party TCT Mobile, Inc.(pty:dft))(Korniczky, Stephen)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/22/2019. (lb)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #21 Non-Resident Attorney John P. Murphy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wi-LAN Inc.; Wi-LAN USA, Inc.; & Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., designating Michelle E. Armond as local counsel. (es)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #20 Non-Resident Attorney Eric M. Albritton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wi-LAN Inc.; Wi-LAN USA, Inc.; & Wi-LAN Labs, Inc. designating Michelle E. Armond as local counsel. (es)
May 15, 2019 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc., upon Defendant TCT Mobile US Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Armond, Michelle)
May 15, 2019 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc., upon Defendant TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Armond, Michelle)
May 15, 2019 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc., upon Defendant TCT Mobile, Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Armond, Michelle)
May 15, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc., upon Defendant TCL Communication, Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix, Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Armond, Michelle)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #26 Non-Resident Attorney Barry J. Bumgardner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wi-LAN Inc.; Wi-LAN USA, Inc.; & Wi-LAN Labs, Inc. plaintiff, designating Michelle Armond as local counsel. (es)
May 13, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barry J. Bumgardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23725745) filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Armond, Michelle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant TCT Mobile, Inc.. (es)
May 13, 2019 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant TCT Mobile US Inc.. (es)
May 13, 2019 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc.. (es)
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant TCL Communication, Inc.. (es)
May 10, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23717470) filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Armond, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric M. Albritton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23714667) filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Armond, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John P. Murphy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eric M. Albritton. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Barry J. Bumgardner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 , Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #6 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc., (Armond, Michelle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Armond, Michelle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23706724 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Wi LAN Labs, Inc., Wi LAN USA, Inc., Wi-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Michelle E Armond added to party Wi LAN Labs, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle E Armond added to party Wi LAN USA, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle E Armond added to party Wi-LAN Inc.(pty:pla))(Armond, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wi-LAN Inc. et al v. Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Communication, Inc.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: Stephen S Korniczky
Represented By: Martin R Bader
Represented By: Ericka J Schulz
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Mobile Communication Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Communication Technology Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCT Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: Stephen S Korniczky
Represented By: Martin R Bader
Represented By: Ericka J Schulz
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Communication Ltd.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCT Mobile International Ltd.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCL Corporation
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCT Mobile US Inc.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: Stephen S Korniczky
Represented By: Martin R Bader
Represented By: Ericka J Schulz
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCT Mobile US Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Yun Louise Lu
Represented By: Stephen S Korniczky
Represented By: Martin R Bader
Represented By: Ericka J Schulz
Represented By: John P Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wi-LAN Inc.
Represented By: Eric M Albritton
Represented By: Barry J Bumgardner
Represented By: John P Murphy
Represented By: Michelle E Armond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wi LAN Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M Albritton
Represented By: Barry J Bumgardner
Represented By: John P Murphy
Represented By: Michelle E Armond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wi LAN USA, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M Albritton
Represented By: Barry J Bumgardner
Represented By: John P Murphy
Represented By: Michelle E Armond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?