Michael Baerg v. Riddell, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michael Baerg
Defendant: Madison All 4 You, LLC, DOES, Riddell, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00929
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT Defendants Riddell, Inc. and Madison All 4 You, LLC's Supplemental Filing in Support of Their Amended Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injuction #21 (pursuant to Court Order #20 filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aronoff, David)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER ALLOWING SUPPLEMENTAL FILING. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #18 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enjoining Defendants from enforcing an invalid and unlawful covenant not to compete in an agreement entitled "Proprietary Interest and Protection Agreement." . Motion #12 Defendant Riddell, Inc. and Madison All 4 You, LLC's Amended Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Allison Boersma, #2 Declaration Gayle I. Jenkins)(Aronoff, David)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment #18 . Please refer to page 4 of Judge Carter's form Scheduling Order, which can be locate on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-david-o-carter. The Court ORDERS the document STRICKEN. (twdb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enjoining Defendants from enforcing an invalid and unlawful covenant not to compete in an agreement entitled "Proprietary Interest and Protection Agreement." . Motion #12 Defendants Riddell, Inc. and Madison All 4 You, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc.. (Aronoff, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER #20 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Dismiss this case in its entirety pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 Defendants Riddell, Inc. and Madison All 4 You, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #2 Affidavit Allison Boersma, #3 Affidavit Gayle Jenkins, #4 Proposed Order) (Aronoff, David) Modified on 7/8/2019 (twdb).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge David O. Carter #14 . The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby continued to 7/29/19 at 8:30 a.m. #12 . Motion set for hearing on 7/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting The Parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue the Scheduling Conference #15 . Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 28, 2019 to July 1, 2019 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 11 filed by Plaintiff Michael Baerg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tukhi, Faheem)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction from July 22, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. to July 29, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enjoining Defendants from enforcing an invalid and unlawful covenant not to compete in an agreement entitled "Proprietary Interest and Protection Agreement." . Motion #12 filed by Plaintiff Michael Baerg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tukhi, Faheem)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 6/28/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 6/28/2019 @ 10:00 AM **TIME CHANGE ONLY** before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re enjoining Defendants from enforcing an invalid and unlawful covenant not to compete in an agreement entitled "Proprietary Interest and Protection Agreement." . Motion filed by Plaintiff Michael Baerg. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Baerg in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Faheem A Tukhi in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Devin S. Vasquez in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Proposed Order) (Tukhi, Faheem)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 6/24/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 6/28/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gayle I Jenkins counsel for Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc.. Adding Gayle I. Jenkins as counsel of record for RIDDELL, INC. and MADISON ALL 4 YOU, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants RIDDELL, INC. and MADISON ALL 4 YOU, LLC. (Attorney Gayle I Jenkins added to party Madison All 4 You, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gayle I Jenkins added to party Riddell, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jenkins, Gayle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1-2 days, filed by Plaintiff Michael Baerg.. (Tukhi, Faheem)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Baerg, (Tukhi, Faheem)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jp)
May 16, 2019 UNCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC., incorrectly identified as KollegeTown; Riddell, Inc. (SUBMITTED IN STATE COURT ATTACHMENT NO. 6 OF EXHIBIT 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Baerg upon Defendant Kollegetown, an Unknown Wisconsin Business Entiry served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Handlen - Director of Operations, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/2/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 3 OF EXHIBIT 1(D) TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michael Baerg, upon Defendant Riddell, Inc., a California Corporation served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mai Yang, Process Specialist, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/2/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT 1C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Michael Baerg against Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/8/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1 OF EXHIBIT 1A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 5/16/2019. (Aronoff, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc., (Aronoff, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc.. (Aronoff, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01062324 Receipt No: 0973-23753497 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Madison All 4 You, LLC, Riddell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1B - Notice of Case Assignment, #3 Exhibit 1C - Proof of Service - Riddell, Inc., #4 Exhibit 1D - Proof of Service - KollegeTown, #5 Exhibit 1E - Notice of Hearing, #6 Exhibit 2 - Answer to State Court Complaint) (Attorney David Lawrence Aronoff added to party Madison All 4 You, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Lawrence Aronoff added to party Riddell, Inc.(pty:dft))(Aronoff, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Baerg v. Riddell, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Baerg
Represented By: Vince Mojica Verde
Represented By: Faheem A Tukhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison All 4 You, LLC
Represented By: David Lawrence Aronoff
Represented By: Gayle I Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell, Inc.
Represented By: David Lawrence Aronoff
Represented By: Gayle I Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?