Charlene Marie Simpson v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Charlene Marie Simpson
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 8:2019cv00959
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV19-959 MRW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Charlene Marie Simpson, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (vm)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated 4/21/17) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (vm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Charlene Marie Simpson, (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Charlene Marie Simpson. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Charlene Marie Simpson. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Charlene Marie Simpson. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Charlene Marie Simpson. (Attorney Lawrence D Rohlfing added to party Charlene Marie Simpson(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charlene Marie Simpson v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Marie Simpson
Represented By: Lawrence D Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?