William Bell et al v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Strauss, Felicia Jeffries, Jessica Kelly, Kinyata Jones, Tonya Skinner, Evan Green, Tommy Bentley, Alejandra Renteria, Brent DeRouen, Ann Harland, Russell Steel, Ryan Frazier, Curtis Resta, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Jan Freyman, Bridget Miller, Fredericka McPherson, Richard Narez, William Bell, Remi Rundzio, Maureen Heiner, Lynn Cox, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Christy Sullivan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Charles Williams, Donna Richards, Kathy Cleghorn, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Nicholas Crouch, Moises Senti, Jason Janson, Vania Silva and Tonya McNeely
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG, TRW Automotive Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., FCA US, LLC, Hyundai Motor Group, Honda Motor Co. Ltd., Kia Motors Corp., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., Honda R and D Co., Ltd., Hyundai Motor Co., Ltd., Toyota Motor Corp., Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., American Honda Motor Co. Inc., TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America and Honda of America MFG. Inc.
Petitioner: McNeely Tonya
Case Number: 8:2019cv00963
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, places this matter on its inactive calendar pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "Panel"). Counsel shall file a joint report every 60 days, with the first report due on August 28, 2019; provided, however, a report shall be filed within five days of a decision by the Panel. Upon receiving a report with respect to an action by the Panel, the Court will determine whether the matter will be returned to its active calendar. All other dates and deadlines are vacated. The stipulations seeking an extension of the time to respond to the Complaint are moot. Dkt. 41, 63, 65, 75, 76, 78. (Made JS-6. Case Stayed / Inactive Calendar) (ake)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #45 Non-Resident Attorney Donald A. Ecklund APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #34 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H. Meltzer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #33 Non-Resident Attorney Natalie Lesser APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #32 Non-Resident Attorney James E. Cecchi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney David. R. Buchanan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Caroline F. Bartlett APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J Marenco APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Mark J. Dearman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Geller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Marc Wites APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, designating Robert G. Lowery as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 80 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riccomini, Kacey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Robinson, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 78 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc..(Attorney Douglas Wayne Robinson added to party Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Robinson, Douglas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,, #70 , Notice of Appearance,, #72 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 19, 2019 Filing 76 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Tsoumas, Tammy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 75 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019; TRW Automotive Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019; TRW Automotive U.S. LLC answer now due 7/19/2019; ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. answer now due 7/19/2019, filed by Defendant TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.; TRW Automotive Inc.; TRW Automotive U.S. LLC; ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp..(Tsoumas, Tammy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. identifying ZF Friedrichshafen AG as Corporate Parent. (Tsoumas, Tammy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 73 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew John Tako counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America. Adding Matthew Tako as counsel of record for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew John Tako added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew John Tako added to party Kia Motors America(pty:dft))(Tako, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas on behalf of Defendants TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party TRW Automotive Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party TRW Automotive U.S. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.(pty:dft))(Tsoumas, Tammy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America. Adding Caroline Van Ness as counsel of record for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness added to party Kia Motors America(pty:dft))(Van Ness, Caroline)
June 19, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark C Holscher on behalf of Defendants TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party TRW Automotive Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party TRW Automotive U.S. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.(pty:dft))(Holscher, Mark)
June 19, 2019 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John H Beisner counsel for Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors America. Adding John H. Beisner as counsel of record for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Inc. and Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attorney John H Beisner added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney John H Beisner added to party Kia Motors America(pty:dft))(Beisner, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 68 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kia Motors America answer now due 7/19/2019; Hyundai Motor America answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Kia Motors America; Hyundai Motor America.(Attorney Lance A Etcheverry added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney Lance A Etcheverry added to party Kia Motors America(pty:dft))(Etcheverry, Lance)
June 19, 2019 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Kia Motors America identifying Kia Motor Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Etcheverry, Lance)
June 19, 2019 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Etcheverry, Lance)
June 19, 2019 Filing 65 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to FCA US, LLC answer now due 7/19/2019, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC.(Attorney Kacey Renee Riccomini added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft))(Riccomini, Kacey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co. Inc., Honda of America MFG. Inc. identifying Honda Motor Co., Ltd. and American Honda Motor Co., Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Horth-Neubert, Stacy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 63 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Honda Motor Co. Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019; Honda of America MFG. Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co. Inc.; Honda of America MFG. Inc..(Attorney Stacy R Horth-Neubert added to party American Honda Motor Co. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stacy R Horth-Neubert added to party Honda of America MFG. Inc.(pty:dft))(Horth-Neubert, Stacy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 62 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 60 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant TRW Automotive Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant TRW Automotive U.S. LLC served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 58 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Co., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 57 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 56 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 55 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant Kia Motors America served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 53 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant Honda of America MFG. Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Statutory Agent Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant FCA US, LLC served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Co., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, Tonya McNeely, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria, upon Defendant American Honda Motor Co. Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loewy, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 49 . The Order was inadvertently issued in this case. Accordingly, Dkt. 49 is stricken. (shb)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 6/10/29 PER CLERICAL ERROR G-11, DKT #50 . (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR HEARING (DKT. #21 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court sets this matter for a Scheduling Conference on September 9, 2019 at 1:30 pm. The deadline for the Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report is continued from June 28, 2019 to August 30, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 6/11/2019 (shb).
June 7, 2019 Filing 45 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald A. Ecklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23882358) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #35 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher A. Seeger APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #36 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa L Troutner APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #37 Non-Resident Attorney Stephen N. Zack APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #39 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Ayres APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams, designating Robert G. Loewry as local counsel. (shb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (DKT. #40 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: SA CV19-00963 JAK (FFMx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials PA on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft))(Nassihi, Amir)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00782 JAK(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-00963 JAK(FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt (rn)
June 4, 2019 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher L. Ayers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23858367) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Bren #27 by Clerk of Court. Document not completely signed. Document is stricken. (mrgo)
May 31, 2019 Filing 37 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen N. Zack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23840052) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 36 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa L. Troutner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23840006) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 35 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher A. Seeger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23839985) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H. Meltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23839921) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Natalie Lesser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23839828) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James E. Cecchi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23839405) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David R. Buchanan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23839297) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caroline F. Bartlett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23839208) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/28/2019, Receipt No. 26HOUIKG) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 29, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Bren #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Local counsel did not sign application. (lt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 38] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23814037) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert) Modified on 6/4/2019 (mrgo).
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark J. Dearman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23813991) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul J. Geller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23813930) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marc Wites to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23813860) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Tonya McNeely, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Loewy, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Honda Motor Co. Inc., FCA US, LLC, Honda Motor Co. Ltd., Honda R and D Co., Ltd., Honda of America MFG. Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Co., Ltd., Hyundai Motor Group, Kia Motors America, Kia Motors Corp., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc., Toyota Motor Corp., Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., ZF Friedrichshafen AG, ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Marc Wites. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stephen N Zach. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Damien Marshall. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Ayers. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David R Buchanan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher A Seeger. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Donald A Ecklund. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Caroline F Bartlett. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James E Cecchi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Natalie Lesser. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melissa L Troutner. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H Meltzer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J Marenco. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark J Dearman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul J Geller. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, McNeely Tonya, Charles Williams. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv- 00846-JLS-KES; 8:19-cv- 00782-CBM-FFM (Loewy, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Loewy, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, McNeely Tonya, Charles Williams. (Loewy, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Maximillian Accetta, William Bell, Tommy Bentley, Billy Blaylock, Angela Bowens, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Kathy Cleghorn, Lynn Cox, Nicholas Crouch, Brent DeRouen, Alvin Duncan, Ryan Frazier, Jan Freyman, Ann Marie Gray, Evan Green, Ann Harland, Maureen Heiner, Jason Janson, Felicia Jeffries, Kinyata Jones, Jessica Kelly, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Richard Narez, Alejandra Renteria, Curtis Resta, Donna Richards, Remi Rundzio, Moises Senti, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Tonya Skinner, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Christy Sullivan, McNeely Tonya, Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Loewy, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23774722 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Brent DeRouen, Kathy Cleghorn, Ryan Frazier, Maximillian Accetta, Alvin Duncan, Ann Marie Gray, Billy Blaylock, William Bell, Lynn Cox, Russell Steel, Gerald Strauss, Kinyata Jones, Tommy Bentley, McNeely Tonya, Moises Senti, Cause 4 Paws, Inc, Donna Richards, Jessica Kelly, Angela Bowens, Felicia Jeffries, Fredericka McPherson, Bridget Miller, Christy Sullivan, Curtis Resta, Charles Williams, Remi Rundzio, Ann Harland, Jason Janson, Maureen Heiner, Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez, Vania Silva, Jan Freyman, Richard Narez, Evan Green, Nicholas Crouch, Tonya Skinner, Alejandra Renteria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Maximillian Accetta(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party William Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Tommy Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Billy Blaylock(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Angela Bowens(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Cause 4 Paws, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Kathy Cleghorn(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Lynn Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Nicholas Crouch(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Brent DeRouen(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Alvin Duncan(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Ryan Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Jan Freyman(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Ann Marie Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Evan Green(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Ann Harland(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Maureen Heiner(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Jason Janson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Felicia Jeffries(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Kinyata Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Jessica Kelly(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Fredericka McPherson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Bridget Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Richard Narez(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Alejandra Renteria(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Curtis Resta(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Donna Richards(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Remi Rundzio(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Moises Senti(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Vania Silva(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Tonya Skinner(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Russell Steel(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Gerald Strauss(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Christy Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party McNeely Tonya(pty:pla), Attorney Robert G Loewy added to party Charles Williams(pty:pla))(Loewy, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Bell et al v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Strauss
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Jeffries
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Kelly
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinyata Jones
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Skinner
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Green
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Bentley
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Renteria
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent DeRouen
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Harland
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Steel
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Frazier
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Resta
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cause 4 Paws, Inc
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Freyman
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Miller
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredericka McPherson
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Narez
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bell
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remi Rundzio
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Heiner
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Cox
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Sepulveda Ramirez
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Sullivan
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Gray
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Blaylock
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Bowens
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Williams
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Richards
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Cleghorn
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximillian Accetta
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Duncan
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Crouch
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Senti
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Janson
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vania Silva
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya McNeely
Represented By: James E Cecchi
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Jenny L Paquette
Represented By: Christopher L Ayers
Represented By: Christopher A Seeger
Represented By: Caroline F Bartlett
Represented By: Mark J Dearman
Represented By: Melissa L Troutner
Represented By: Stacey M Kaplan
Represented By: Robert G Loewy
Represented By: Joseph H Meltzer
Represented By: Paul J Geller
Represented By: Stephen N Zack
Represented By: Marc A Wites
Represented By: David R Buchanan
Represented By: Natalie Lesser
Represented By: Donald A Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: McNeely Tonya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive Inc.
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Wayne Robinson
Represented By: Erica M Sorosky
Represented By: Christopher J Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Kacey Renee Riccomini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R and D Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Straus
Represented By: Michael L Mallow
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Aleeza Straus
Represented By: Michael L Mallow
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co. Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: John H Beisner
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda of America MFG. Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?