Acrisure of California, LLC v. TLondon Insurance Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company and Acrisure of California, LLC
Defendant: TLONDON INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, DOES, Tricia London, TLondon Insurance Services, LLC and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00981
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark David Erickson counsel for Defendants Tricia London, TLondon Insurance Services, LLC, Counter Claimants Tricia London, TLondon Insurance Services, LLC. Adding Mark D. Erickson as counsel of record for TLondon Insurance Services, LLC and Tricia London for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Cross-Complainants TLondon Insurance Services, LLC and Tricia London. (Attorney Mark David Erickson added to party Tricia London (pty:dft), Attorney Mark David Erickson added to party Tricia London (pty:cc), Attorney Mark David Erickson added to party TLondon Insurance Services, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Mark David Erickson added to party TLondon Insurance Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Erickson, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Acrisure of California, LLC, upon Defendant TLondon Insurance Services, LLC served on 6/3/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patricia Mayeda, Paralegal and Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pliner, Jessica)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Acrisure of California, LLC, upon Defendant Tricia London served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patricia Mayeda, Paralegal and Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Pliner, Jessica)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL / SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Tricia London, TLondon Insurance Services, LLC, (Vincent, Thomas)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Acrisure of California, LLC filed by Defendant Tricia London, TLondon Insurance Services, LLC.(Attorney Thomas L Vincent added to party Tricia London (pty:dft), Attorney Thomas L Vincent added to party TLondon Insurance Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Vincent, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TLondon Insurance Services, LLC answer now due 7/5/2019, filed by Plaintiff Acrisure of California, LLC.(Pliner, Jessica)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant TLondon Insurance Services, LLC. a California Limited Liability Company (yl)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-00981 PA(RAOx). (rn)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Acrisure of California, LLC. (Pliner, Jessica)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company, (Pliner, Jessica)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Pliner, Jessica)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23786844 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint) (Attorney Jessica Stuart Pliner added to party ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company(pty:pla))(Pliner, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acrisure of California, LLC v. TLondon Insurance Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC a Michigan limited liability company
Represented By: Jessica Stuart Pliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acrisure of California, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Stuart Pliner
Represented By: Joseph R Lordan
Represented By: Sumy Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLONDON INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricia London
Represented By: Mark David Erickson
Represented By: Thomas L Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLondon Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Mark David Erickson
Represented By: Thomas L Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?