Silverado Hospice, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar II
Plaintiff: Silverado Hospice, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar and Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 8:2019cv01007
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alex M. Azar, II answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Alex M. Azar, II.(Attorney Karen Yumi Paik added to party Alex M. Azar, II(pty:dft))(Paik, Karen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc., upon Defendant Alex M. Azar, II served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk G. Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to HHS Clerk Shantell Siggetts. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Daucher, Brian)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of United States Department of Health and Human Services. (gk)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc.. (Daucher, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc.. (Daucher, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc., identifying Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. (Daucher, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc.. (Daucher, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23804685 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Brian M Daucher added to party Silverado Hospice, Inc.(pty:pla))(Daucher, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverado Hospice, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Karen Yumi Paik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silverado Hospice, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Daucher
Represented By: Ashton Taylor-Misha Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?