Affinia Default Services, LLC v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Defendant: Claimants to Real Property Located at: 13 La Paloma, Dana Point, CA 92629
Claimant: United States of America
In Re: Claimants to Real Property Located at 13 La Paloma, Dana Point, California 92629
Case Number: 8:2019cv01050
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing the Official Record of a State-Court Proceeding filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(Tanner, Jolene)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Petition (case opening), Answer and Claim filed by Claimant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Tanner, Jolene)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 08/05/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 07/29/2019. (lb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
May 30, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PETITION and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustees Sale filed against Claimants to Real Property Located at 13 La Paloma, Dana Point, California 92629. Filed by Petitioner Affinia Default Services, LLC. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Claimant United States of America. (Tanner, Jolene)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01058484 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Claimant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B) (Attorney Jolene Tanner added to party United States of America(pty:clm))(Tanner, Jolene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affinia Default Services, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claimants to Real Property Located at: 13 La Paloma, Dana Point, CA 92629
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: United States of America
Represented By: Jolene Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Claimants to Real Property Located at 13 La Paloma, Dana Point, California 92629
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?