Steven Eric Gould v. County of Orange et al
Plaintiff: Steven Eric Gould
Defendant: Sandra Hutchens as a former employee of County of Orange, a public entity, COUNTY OF ORANGE erroneously sued as Orange County Sheriffs Dept., Does 1 to 100, Sandra Hutchens and County of Orange
Case Number: 8:2019cv01090
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Steven Eric Gould CDCBE5607 C.T.F. Facility Po Box 689 Soledad, CA 93960 re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #7 (sbou)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5 filed by Defendants County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens. (Quartararo, Stephanie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Request for Judicial Notice #6 , filed by Plaintiff Steven Eric Gould. (sbou)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) (1) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AND (2) VACATING HEARING DATE AND TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. #5 Plaintiff's response/opposition to Defendants' Motion is due June 25, 2019, and Defendants' reply is due July 2, 2019. See Local Rules 7-9, 7-10. Plaintiff is cautioned that the failure timely to file an opposition to Defendants' Motion may be deemed consent to the granting of Defendants' Motion pursuant to Local Rule 7-12 and may result in dismissal which could end this case as against the Defendants. (see document for details) (klg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5 filed by Defendants County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Quartararo, Stephanie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants County of Orange, Sandra Hutchens. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Quartararo, Stephanie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
June 3, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Steven Eric Gould, upon Defendant Sandra Hutchens acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Marianne Van Riper, County Counsel. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1) (lh)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants County of Orange, Does 1 to 100, Sandra Hutchens pursuant to 42:1983. Filed by Plaintiff Steven Eric Gould. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/20/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants COUNTY OF ORANGE erroneously sued as Orange County Sheriffs Dept., Sandra Hutchens as a former employee of County of Orange, a public entity, (Quartararo, Stephanie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants COUNTY OF ORANGE erroneously sued as Orange County Sheriffs Dept., Sandra Hutchens as a former employee of County of Orange, a public entity. (Quartararo, Stephanie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, Civil Complex, case number 30-2018-00980616 Receipt No: 0973-23851236 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Sandra Hutchens as a former employee of County of Orange, a public entity, COUNTY OF ORANGE erroneously sued as Orange County Sheriffs Dept.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B) (Attorney Stephanie Ann Quartararo added to party COUNTY OF ORANGE erroneously sued as Orange County Sheriffs Dept.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie Ann Quartararo added to party Sandra Hutchens as a former employee of County of Orange, a public entity(pty:dft))(Quartararo, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Eric Gould v. County of Orange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Hutchens as a former employee of County of Orange, a public entity
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Quartararo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ORANGE erroneously sued as Orange County Sheriffs Dept.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Quartararo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Hutchens
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Quartararo
Represented By: Daniel K Spradlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Orange
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Quartararo
Represented By: Daniel K Spradlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Eric Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?