Phillip Walker et al v. Laitek Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Philip Walker
Defendant: Laitek Inc. and Does 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01107
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 3, 2020. (tg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 7/19/2019, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Scheduling Report filed by Plaintiff Philip Walker. (Kring, Kyle)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 7/19/2019 at 10:30 A.M. (tg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
June 4, 2019 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Laitek Inc. (submitted as document 1, attachment 4)(esa)
June 4, 2019 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Philip Walker, upon Defendant Laitek Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/16/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Jospeh Connaughton, Attorney. (submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
June 4, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Laitek Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Philip Walker. (Filed in state court 4/9/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 4) (esa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Laitek Inc. (Connaughton, E)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Laitek Inc., (Connaughton, E)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Laitek Inc.. (Connaughton, E)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01062591-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23858904 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Laitek Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fred M. Behlen, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Notice and Acknowledgment, #4 Exhibit C-Answer, #5 Exhibit D-Docket and Other Documents) (Attorney E Joseph Connaughton added to party Laitek Inc.(pty:dft))(Connaughton, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillip Walker et al v. Laitek Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Walker
Represented By: Kyle D Kring
Represented By: Kerri Nikole Polizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laitek Inc.
Represented By: E Joseph Connaughton
Represented By: Mary E Allain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?