Balboa Capital Corporation v. Innovix Medical PLLC al
Plaintiff: Balboa Captial Corporation and Balboa Capital Corporation
Defendant: Innovix Medical Corporation PLLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Lori Solomon and Innovix Medical PLLC
Counter Defendant: Roes
3Rd Party Defendant: Cutera Inc and MMP Capital, Inc
Case Number: 8:2019cv01145
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference from August 30, 2019 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #30 filed by Third-Party Defendant Cutera Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Corneil, David)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Third-Party Complaint #37 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Third-Party Defendant CUTERA, INC., should answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 8/9/2019. (jp)
July 30, 2019 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cutera Inc answer now due 8/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 filed by Third-Party Defendant Cutera Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Certificate of Service)(Attorney David Corneil added to party Cutera Inc(pty:3pd))(Corneil, David)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. SACV19-00482 AG (KESx) (lwag)
July 26, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MMP Capital, Inc answer now due 8/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 filed by Third-Party Defendant MMP Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Andrew K Alper added to party MMP Capital, Inc(pty:3pd))(Alper, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Third-Party Plaintiffs Innovix Medical PLLC. as to Cutera Inc. (Lanza, Anthony)
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Third-Party Plaintiffs Innovix Medical PLLC. as to MMP Capital, Inc. (Lanza, Anthony)
July 19, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings [L.R. 83-1.4] filed by Defendant Innovix Medical PLLC. (Lanza, Anthony)
July 19, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Innovix Medical PLLC. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00482-AG-KES; 8:16-cv-00099-JLS-KES; 8:11-cv-01959-JVS-MLG; 8:18-cv-01339-AG-KES; 8:17-cv-02134-JLS-DFM; 8:17-cv-01072-JLS-KES (Lanza, Anthony)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 8/30/2019 at 10:30 A.M. (tg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 29 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Balboa Capital Corporation.. (Fletcher, Matthew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Counterclaim #8 filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Balboa Capital Corporation.(Fletcher, Matthew)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM #26 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Balboa's deadline to file a response to Innovix Parties Counterclaim is now Friday, July 12, 2019. (bm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Balboa Capital Corporation answer now due 7/12/2019, re Counterclaim #8 filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Balboa Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Matthew John Fletcher added to party Balboa Capital Corporation(pty:cd))(Fletcher, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew John Fletcher counsel for Plaintiff Balboa Capital Corporation. Adding Kevin K. Nguyen as counsel of record for Balboa Capital Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Balboa Capital Corporation. (Fletcher, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew John Fletcher counsel for Plaintiff Balboa Capital Corporation. Adding Jesse J. Bolling as counsel of record for Balboa Capital Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Balboa Capital Corporation. (Fletcher, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew John Fletcher counsel for Plaintiff Balboa Capital Corporation. Adding Matthew J. Fletcher as counsel of record for Balboa Capital Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Balboa Capital Corporation. (Attorney Matthew John Fletcher added to party Balboa Capital Corporation(pty:pla))(Fletcher, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 Text Only Entry (IN CHAMBERS) Having received and reviewed Defendants' timely Response (Doc. 16), the Court DISCHARGES its Order to Show Cause issued June 19, 2019. (Doc. 12). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #8 as to Counter Defendant Balboa Capital Corporation. (jp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #15 filed by Defendants, Counter-Claimants & Third Party Plaintiffs Innovix Medical PLLC, Lori Solomon. (Lanza, Anthony)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #15 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please indicate "as to COUNTERCLAIM" right after SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third-Party Complaint #9 as to Third-Party Defendant MMP Capital, Inc. (jp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third-Party Complaint #9 as to Third-Party Defendant Cutera Inc. (jp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Innovix Medical PLLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #12 (Lanza, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Counterclaim #8 filed by Counter-Claimants Innovix Medical PLLC, Lori Solomon. (Lanza, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 filed by Third-Party Plaintiffs Innovix Medical PLLC, Lori Solomon. (Lanza, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Innovix Medical PLLC, Lori Solomon. (Lanza, Anthony)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) RE: UNTIMELY REMOVAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Defendants are ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than five (5) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be remanded for want of federal jurisdiction or failure to timely remove. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #10 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendant's name must appear in the "To:" section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Innovix Medical PLLC. (Lanza, Anthony)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Cutera Inc., MMP Capital, Inc., Third party Does 1 through 10, inclusive filed by Third-Party Plaintiffs Innovix Medical PLLC.(Lanza, Anthony) Modified on 6/20/2019 (jp).
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendants Balboa Capital Corporation; Jury Demand, filed by Counter-Claimants Innovix Medical PLLC, Lori Solomon.(Lanza, Anthony)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Innovix Medical PLLC, Lori Solomon, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on June 11, 2019. (Lanza, Anthony)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
June 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Innovix Medical PLLC, Lori Solomon. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Balboa Capital Corporation. Filed in State Court on 3/19/19 Submitted with Exhibit A to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Balboa Capital Corporation, Innovix Medical PLLC, Lori Solomon, M.D., Molham Solomon, M.D. and Cutera, Inc.. (Lanza, Anthony)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Innovix Medical Corporation PLLC, Lori Solomon. (Lanza, Anthony)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01058477-CU-CL-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23886111 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Innovix Medical Corporation PLLC, Lori Solomon. (Attorney Anthony L Lanza added to party Innovix Medical Corporation PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony L Lanza added to party Lori Solomon(pty:dft))(Lanza, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balboa Capital Corporation v. Innovix Medical PLLC al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Lori Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Innovix Medical PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balboa Captial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balboa Capital Corporation
Represented By: Marisa D Poulos
Represented By: Michelle Anne M Chiongson
Represented By: Jesse K Bolling
Represented By: Matthew John Fletcher
Represented By: Kevin Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovix Medical Corporation PLLC
Represented By: Anthony L Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cutera Inc
Represented By: David Corneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MMP Capital, Inc
Represented By: Andrew K Alper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?