James Carroll et al v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Md Ullah, Eldon Painter and James Carroll
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, ZF Friedrichshafen AG, ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Honda Motor Co. Ltd., Hyundai Motor America, Toyota Motor Corporation and American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01155
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
2 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
3 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, places this matter on its inactive calendar pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the Panel). Counsel shall file a joint report every 60 days, with the first report due on August 28, 2019; provided, however, a report shall be filed within five days of a decision by the Panel. Upon receiving a report with respect to an action by the Panel, the Court will determine whether the matter will be returned to its active calendar. All other dates and deadlines are vacated. The stipulation seeking an extension of time to respond to the Complaint is moot. Dkt. 26. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated), (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Richard D. Meadow APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah, designating Eric H. Gibbs as local counsel. (shb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Alex J, Brown APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah, designating Eric H. Gibbs as local counsel. (shb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #27 , Notice of Appearance #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stacy R Horth-Neubert on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Attorney Stacy R Horth-Neubert added to party American Honda Motor Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Horth-Neubert, Stacy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. identifying Honda Motor Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Gilford, Lisa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lisa Gilford on behalf of Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Attorney Lisa Gilford added to party American Honda Motor Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gilford, Lisa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, File Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to L.R. 23-3, and Modification of Briefing Schedule filed by Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew John Tako counsel for Defendant Hyundai Motor America. Adding Matthew Tako as counsel of record for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew John Tako added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Tako, Matthew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness counsel for Defendant Hyundai Motor America. Adding Caroline Van Ness as counsel of record for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attorney Caroline Williams Van Ness added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Van Ness, Caroline)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John H Beisner counsel for Defendant Hyundai Motor America. Adding John H. Beisner as counsel of record for Hyundai Motor America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attorney John H Beisner added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Beisner, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Etcheverry, Lance)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. identifying ZF Friedrichshafen AG as Corporate Parent. (Tsoumas, Tammy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas counsel for Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. Adding Tammy A. Tsoumas as counsel of record for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.(pty:dft))(Tsoumas, Tammy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark C Holscher counsel for Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. Adding Mark C. Holscher as counsel of record for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Mark C. Holscher. (Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.(pty:dft))(Holscher, Mark)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney W. Mark Lanier on behalf of Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard D. Meadow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23943222) filed by Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Gibbs, Eric)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alex J. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23943064) filed by Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Gibbs, Eric)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 19-00782-JAK (FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge James V. Selna to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 19-01155-JAK (FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (dv)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney W. Mark Lanier. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard D. Meadow. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alex J. Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Honda Motor Co. Ltd., Hyundai Motor America, Hyundai Motor Company, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., ZF Friedrichshafen AG, ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (car)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Eldon Painter, Md Ullah. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00782; 2:19-cv-04256; 8:19-cv-00963; 8:19-cv-00846; 8:19-cv-00970 (Gibbs, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah, (Gibbs, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Eric H. Gibbs Pursuant to California Civil Code Section 1780(d) filed by Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah. (Gibbs, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah. (Gibbs, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James Carroll, Eldon Painter, Md Ullah. (Gibbs, Eric)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23896005 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Eldon Painter, Md Ullah, James Carroll. (Attorney Eric H Gibbs added to party James Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Eric H Gibbs added to party Eldon Painter(pty:pla), Attorney Eric H Gibbs added to party Md Ullah(pty:pla))(Gibbs, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Carroll et al v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Matthew John Tako
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: John H Beisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy R Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Lisa Gilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Md Ullah
Represented By: David K Stein
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: Jeffrey B Kosbie
Represented By: Richard D Meadow
Represented By: Alex J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon Painter
Represented By: David K Stein
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: Jeffrey B Kosbie
Represented By: Richard D Meadow
Represented By: Alex J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carroll
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: David K Stein
Represented By: Jeffrey B Kosbie
Represented By: Richard D Meadow
Represented By: Alex J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?