Zachery Quintana v. Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Plaintiff: Zachery Quintana
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, David Wilsons Ford of Orange and DOES 1 through 30, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01202
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On 8/2/2019, Defendant filed a Notice of Settlement (doc. #10 ), indicating that the case has fully settled. Based thereon, the Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 9/5/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Berkley, David)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING The Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #8 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the deadline for Defendants Ford of Orange and Ford Credit to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, currently set for 7/15/2019, is extended to 8/5/2019. (jp)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ford Motor Credit Company LLC answer now due 8/5/2019, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berkley, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company LLC.(Berkley, David)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Zachery Quintana in Orange County Superior Court on 5/16/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, identifying Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Berkley, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01070335-CU-BT-CJC with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 06/17/2019, receipt number 0973-23932336), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney David Allan Berkley added to party Ford Motor Credit Company LLC(pty:dft))(Berkley, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Berkley, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zachery Quintana v. Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachery Quintana
Represented By: Hovanes Margarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Represented By: David Allan Berkley
Represented By: Scott J Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wilsons Ford of Orange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?