Sobertec LLC et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sobertec LLC and Beachside Recovery LLC
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation, United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealthcare Service LLC, United Behavioral Health Inc., Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Does 1-100, inclusive, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, Optum Services, Inc. and OptumInsight, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01206
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 31 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Remand Case #21 previously set for 8/12/2019 at 1:30 pm is continued to 8/26/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY Reply In Support of Motion for Remand and Request for Expenses and Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Plaintiffs Beachside Recovery LLC, Sobertec LLC. (Zimmitti, Salvatore)
August 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Divya Gupta to Andrew Holly. filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC, (Gupta, Divya)
July 29, 2019 Filing 28 Opposition in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. (Gupta, Divya)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR REMAND #26 by Judge James V. Selna. 1. Defendants shall file their response to the Motion for Remand on or before July 29, 2019; 2. Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of the Motion for Remand on or before August 5, 2019; 3. The hearing on the Motion for Remand shall remain on August 12, 2019. (es)
July 18, 2019 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Order,, #23 filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gupta, Divya)
July 17, 2019 Filing 25 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Beachside Recovery LLC, Sobertec LLC, identifying SOBERTEC LLC, a California limited liability company-Plaintiff; BEACHSIDE RECOVERY LLC, a California limited liability company-Plaintiff; Skyline Recovery LLC-Parent of Plaintiffs; Upfront, a California S-corporation-Parent of Skyline Recovery LLC; International Consulting Group LLC-Ownership interest in Upfront; Adam Regiaba-Ownership interest in Upfront; Arthur Atinizian-Ownership interest in Upfront. (Zimmitti, Salvatore)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES #22 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) The Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference shall be continued to September 16, 2019 [note date change] at 11:00 a.m.; and (2) The parties shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report by September 9, 2019. (es)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION TO STAY THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE INITIAL COMPLAINT PENDING RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #20 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court being fully advised of the premises hereby: ORDERS, ADJUDGES, AND DECREES that: 1. The Motion is GRANTED on the terms set forth herein. 2. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Plaintiffs' initial complaint, whether by answer, motion, or otherwise, and without waiving any defenses, shall be stayed until thirty (30) days after the Court issues a definitive order on Plaintiffs motion to remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (es)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and Related Dates from August 19, 2019 to September 9, 2019 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #19 filed by Plaintiffs Beachside Recovery LLC, Sobertec LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference)(Zimmitti, Salvatore)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Beachside Recovery LLC, Sobertec LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion for Remand and Request for Fees and Expenses; Declaration of Rothenberg, #2 Declaration of K Bowles In Support Of Motion for Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand) (Zimmitti, Salvatore)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gupta, Divya)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 08/19/2019 at 11:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 08/12/2019. (lb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #13 Non-Resident Attorney Meghan L. DesLauriers APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant UnitedHealth Group, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; UnitedHealthCare Service, LLC; OptumInsight, Inc.; and Optum Services, Inc., designating Divya S. Gupta as local counsel. (es)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant UnitedHealth Group, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; UnitedHealthCare Service, LLC; OptumInsight, Inc.; and Optum Services, Inc., designating Divya S. Gupta as local counsel. (es)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew J. Holly APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant UnitedHealth Group, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; UnitedHealthCare Service, LLC; OptumInsight, Inc.; and Optum Services, Inc., designating Divya S. Gupta as local counsel. (es)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew J. Holly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23980746) filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23980699) filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meghan L. DesLauriers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23980652) filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Behavioral Health Inc. answer now due 7/24/2019; UnitedHealth Group Inc. answer now due 7/24/2019; UnitedHealthcare Service LLC answer now due 7/24/2019; OptumInsight, Inc. answer now due 7/24/2019; Optum Services, Inc. answer now due 7/24/2019; United HealthCare Services Inc. answer now due 7/24/2019; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company answer now due 7/24/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Service LLC; OptumInsight, Inc. ; Optum Services, Inc.; United HealthCare Services Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company.(Gupta, Divya)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment for Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 19-01206-JVS (MRWx). (dv)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Meghan Deslauriers. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Holly. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S Grant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) Modified on 6/18/2019 (car).
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, inclusive, Optum Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Sobertec LLC, Beachside Recovery LLC. Filed in State Court on 5/14/19 Submitted with Exhibit A pg. 10 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Federal Court of Having Filed Notice of Removal with State Court and Adverse Party filed by Defendants OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. (Gupta, Divya)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC, identifying UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, United Behavioral Health, Inc., UnitedHealth Service LLC, OptumInsight, Inc., and Optum Services, Inc.. (Gupta, Divya)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United Behavioral Health Inc., United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation, UnitedHealthcare Service LLC. (Gupta, Divya)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01069823 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 06/17/2019, receipt number 2617H6E8), filed by Defendants United Behavioral Health Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthcare Service LLC, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, United HealthCare Services Inc., UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ngoc Han Nguyen) (Attorney Divya Gupta added to party OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United Behavioral Health Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party United HealthCare Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UnitedHealth Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UnitedHealthcare Service LLC(pty:dft))(Gupta, Divya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sobertec LLC et al v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Service LLC
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInsight, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Andrew J Holly
Represented By: Meghan L DesLauriers
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sobertec LLC
Represented By: Zachary E Rothenberg
Represented By: Salvatore John Zimmitti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beachside Recovery LLC
Represented By: Zachary E Rothenberg
Represented By: Salvatore John Zimmitti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?