Mercedes Tiongson v. ICCV International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mercedes Tiongson
Defendant: ICCV International, Inc. and Imelda Caro
Case Number: 8:2019cv01237
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants ICCV International, Inc., Imelda Caro.(Attorney Bret Martin added to party Imelda Caro(pty:dft), Attorney Bret Martin added to party ICCV International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Martin, Bret)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mercedes Tiongson, upon Defendant Imelda Caro served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Imelda Caro in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Baumler, Nina)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mercedes Tiongson, upon Defendant ICCV International, Inc. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Imelda Caro, CEO in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Baumler, Nina)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Imelda Caro, ICCV International, Inc. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mercedes Tiongson. (Baumler, Nina)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mercedes Tiongson. (Baumler, Nina)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mercedes Tiongson, identifying Imelda Caro and ICCV International, Inc.. (Baumler, Nina)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23956228 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mercedes Tiongson. (Attorney Nina Jane Baumler added to party Mercedes Tiongson(pty:pla))(Baumler, Nina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercedes Tiongson v. ICCV International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICCV International, Inc.
Represented By: Bret Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imelda Caro
Represented By: Bret Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Tiongson
Represented By: Nina Jane Baumler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?