Matthew Goldenhar v. Plains All American GP LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Goldenhar
Defendant: Plains All American GP LLC and Does 1-20
Case Number: 8:2019cv01245
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than June 12, 2020. (tg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 8/9/2019, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-5 Days, filed by Defendant Plains All American GP LLC.. (Meltzer, Joshua)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Supplement To The Notice Of Removal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1447(B) filed by Defendant Plains All American GP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Heinicke, Malcolm)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/9/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. See attached Order for details. (rrp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (rrp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Plains All American GP LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 6/21/2019. (Heinicke, Malcolm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
June 21, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Plains All American GP LLC. Filed in State Court on 6/19/19 Submitted with Exhibit F attachment 6 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 21, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Goldenhar, upon Defendant Plains All American GP LLC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/7/2019 Submitted with Exhibit E Attachment 5 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 21, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Matthew Goldenhar, upon Defendant Plains All American GP LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Joshua Meltzer, Attorney for Defendant. Submitted with Exhibit D Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 21, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-20, Plains All American GP LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Matthew Goldenhar. Filed in State Court on 2/20/19 Submitted with Exhibit A attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Plains All American GP LLC, identifying Plains G.P. Holdings, L.P.. (Heinicke, Malcolm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Plains All American GP LLC. (Heinicke, Malcolm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2019-01052911 Receipt No: 0973-23961236 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Plains All American GP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P) (Attorney Malcolm A Heinicke added to party Plains All American GP LLC(pty:dft))(Heinicke, Malcolm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Goldenhar v. Plains All American GP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Goldenhar
Represented By: Brett D Szmanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains All American GP LLC
Represented By: Joshua Semonoff Meltzer
Represented By: Malcolm A Heinicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?