Waterworks Aquatics et al v. Andrew Brown et al
Plaintiff: CB Aquatic Ventures, LLC, Waterworks Aquatics Pasadena, Aquatic Ventures, LLC, Waterworks Aquatics San Jose, Waterworks Aquatics CB, Waterworks Aquatics, SJ Aquatic Ventures, LLC and Pasadena Aquatic Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Andrew Brown, Internal Revenue Service, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01318
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #19 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the Scheduling Conference set for 09/06/2019 at 10:30 AM., is hereby CONTINUED to 10/25/2019 at 10:30 AM. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties confer on a discovery plan no later than 10/4/2019 (21 days before the Scheduling Conference), and timely file a join Rule 26(f) Report. (jp)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 6, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. to October 25, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #17 filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ryan S Watson added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Watson, Ryan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Andrew Brown #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 9/6/2019 at 10:30 a.m. See document for details. (tg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 IN INTERPLEADER filed by Defendant Andrew Brown.(Attorney Steven R Mather added to party Andrew Brown(pty:dft))(Mather, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant Andrew Brown c/o Steve Mather, Mather Turanchik acknowledgment sent by Plaintiffs on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Steve Mather, Attorney. (Bidna, Howard). Modified on 7/17/2019 (jp).
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Andrew Brown. (mrgo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Internal Revenue Service. (mrgo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant United States of America. (mrgo)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Waterworks Aquatics. (Bidna, Howard)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Waterworks Aquatics. (Bidna, Howard)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Waterworks Aquatics. (Bidna, Howard)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Waterworks Aquatics. (Bidna, Howard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Waterworks Aquatics. (Bidna, Howard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Waterworks Aquatics. (Bidna, Howard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Howard M Bidna added to party Aquatic Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Howard M Bidna added to party CB Aquatic Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Howard M Bidna added to party Pasadena Aquatic Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Howard M Bidna added to party SJ Aquatic Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Howard M Bidna added to party Waterworks Aquatics CB (pty:pla), Attorney Howard M Bidna added to party Waterworks Aquatics Pasadena(pty:pla), Attorney Howard M Bidna added to party Waterworks Aquatics San Jose(pty:pla))(Bidna, Howard)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24027575 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Waterworks Aquatics. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Howard M Bidna added to party Waterworks Aquatics(pty:pla))(Bidna, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waterworks Aquatics et al v. Andrew Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CB Aquatic Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Howard M Bidna
Represented By: Evan M Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterworks Aquatics Pasadena
Represented By: Howard M Bidna
Represented By: Evan M Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aquatic Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Howard M Bidna
Represented By: Evan M Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterworks Aquatics San Jose
Represented By: Howard M Bidna
Represented By: Evan M Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterworks Aquatics CB
Represented By: Howard M Bidna
Represented By: Evan M Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterworks Aquatics
Represented By: Howard M Bidna
Represented By: Evan M Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJ Aquatic Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Howard M Bidna
Represented By: Evan M Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasadena Aquatic Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Howard M Bidna
Represented By: Evan M Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Brown
Represented By: Steven R Mather
Represented By: Lydia Bottome Turanchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ryan S Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?