Abdul R. Bynum v. Josie Gastelo
Petitioner: Abdul R. Bynum
Respondent: Josie Gastelo
Case Number: 8:2019cv01345
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 into the registry of the Court from Abdul R. Bynum. Re: Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P) #6 . Receipt number SA015798. (rrp)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Respondent shall file the Answer on or before October 14, 2019. re #8 (sbou)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Josie Gastelo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beesley, Christopher)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher P Beesley on behalf of Respondent Josie Gastelo (Beesley, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. denying #5 . The Court is in receipt of Petitioner's Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed July 22, 2019. The request is DENIED. The certified account statement attached to the declaration reflects an account balance of $227.82 as of July 19, 2019. Petitioner is ordered to remit the $5.00 filing fee to the Clerk's Office within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. (sbou)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Abdul R. Bynum. (sbou)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND INSTRUCTIONS GOVERNING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: that Respondent Josie Gastelo file Answer to the Petition not later than 8/15/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 8/15/2019. Traverse due by 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111 Notice Re Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition, #2 CV-60P) (car)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support [Superior Court No: 16WF0127] filed by Petitioner Abdul R. Bynum Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 (car)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Abdul R. Bynum. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdul R. Bynum v. Josie Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josie Gastelo
Represented By: Christopher P Beesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdul R. Bynum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?