Ricky Dillingham v. Superior Court of California
Petitioner: Ricky Dillingham
Respondent: Superior Court of California
Case Number: 8:2019cv01348
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-55959 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #7 as to Petitioner Ricky Dillingham. (sbou)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Petitioner Ricky Dillingham. Appeal of Judgment #5 Filed On: 7/17/2019; Entered On: 7/31/2019; Certificate of Appealability ruled on 7/17/19 see doc 6. (car)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Funds filed by Petitioner Ricky Dillingham. (sbou)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez denying Certificate of Appealability. (mat)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Petition is denied and the action is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Related to: Memorandum & Opinion #4 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (et)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING PETITION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS ORDERED that Judgment be entered dismissing this petition for lack of jurisdiction. (et)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon,(Filing fee due), filed by petitioner Ricky Dillingham. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricky Dillingham v. Superior Court of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricky Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superior Court of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?