Hamed Kabir v. United States of America
Petitioner: Hamed Kabir
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv01353
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY TO PETITIONERS OPPOSITION filed by Respondent United States of America. (LeBlanc, Paul)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Judge James V. Selna: Petitioner Hamed Kabir ("Kabir") has applied for the appointment of counsel. Kabir has not made a sufficient showing to warrant the appointment of counsel. The application is denied. (es)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. (es)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Petitioner Hamed Kabir. (es)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum of Law Original Constitutional Non-Statutory Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Hamed Kabir. (es)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Assistance of Counsel filed by petitioner Hamed Kabir. (es)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss #4 filed by Petitioner Hamed Kabir. (es)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE BRIEFING by Judge James V. Selna: On July 10, 2019, Defendant Hamed Kabir filed a "Demand for Immediate Subrogation & Exoneration" [Dkt 1]. The Court deemed it a motion pursuant to 28 USC Section 2255. On July 16, 2019, the Government filed a Motion to Dismiss [Dkt 4]. Any opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be filed by August 30, 2019. Any reply brief shall be filed by September 13, 2019 whereupon the matter stands submitted. (es)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 GOVERNMENTS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS DEMAND FOR IMMEDIATE SUBROGATION & EXONERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE filed by Respondent United States of America (LeBlanc, Paul) Modified on 7/17/2019 (es).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Paul LeBlanc on behalf of Respondent United States of America. (Attorney Paul C LeBlanc added to party United States of America(pty:res))(LeBlanc, Paul)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (ghap)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge James V. Selna. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 8:18-cr-35-JVS, filed by petitioner Hamed Kabir. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamed Kabir v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney SA-CR
Represented By: Paul C LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hamed Kabir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?