Gwynith Perkins v. SF Markets, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Gwynith Perkins
Defendant: SF Markets, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market Holdings, LLC, DOES 1-50, Inclusive,, SF Markets, LLC and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01358
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Gwynith Perkins.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates)(Irons, Alexandra)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #18 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baldwin, Rudie)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant SF Markets, LLC amending Notice of Removal #12 , Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Gwynith Perkins(Irons, Alexandra)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 9/27/2019 at 10:30 a.m. See document for details. (tg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:19-cv-01358 JLS(DFMx). (rn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other),, #1 , Notice of Removal #12 . The following error(s) was found: A claim initiating document was filed using a non-claim initiating event in CM/ECF. As a result, the case was not properly classified in the CM/ECF system. The error has been corrected by re-docketing the claim initiating document using the correct event. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Gwynith Perkins.. (Irons, Alexandra)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Notice of Removal, Request for Judicial Notice, Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties and Answer were not filed and entered under their correct events/reliefs. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
July 15, 2019 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-24081570 for $400 filing fee. (Baldwin, Rudie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (esa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California Orange County, case number 30-02019-01064473-CU-PO-CJC, filed by defendant SF Markets, LLC. * NOTICE OF REMOVAL DOCKETED IN CORRECT EVENT * (esa)
July 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, SF Markets, LLC, filed by plaintiff Gwynith Perkins. (Filed in state court 4/18/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 4) (esa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 * ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED AS MISCELLANEOUS * Answer to the Complaint filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market Holdings, LLC re: Miscellaneous Document #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice (Other) #4 , Notice (Other), #1 , Notice (Other) #5 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baldwin, Rudie) Modified on 7/16/2019 (esa).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Pendency of Other Actions filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baldwin, Rudie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 * CERTIFICATE/NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES FILED AS NOTICE OTHER * NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baldwin, Rudie) Modified on 7/16/2019 (esa).
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 * REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED AS MISCELLANEOUS * Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market Holdings, LLC re: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice (Other), #1 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baldwin, Rudie) Modified on 7/16/2019 (esa).
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Baldwin, Rudie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 *NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED AS NOTICE (OTHER) * NOTICE Notice of Removal filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Email Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit Business Search Entity Details, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal from State Court to Federal District Court, #6 Proof of Service)(Baldwin, Rudie) Modified on 7/16/2019 (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gwynith Perkins v. SF Markets, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwynith Perkins
Represented By: Alexandra M Irons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Markets, LLC dba Sprouts Farmers Market Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Markets, LLC
Represented By: Rudie Dane Baldwin
Represented By: Michael L Amaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?