Wenyu Zhu v. David Lester et al
Petitioner: Wenyu Zhu
Respondent: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo, Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, David Lester, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Donna Campagnolo and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 8:2019cv01361
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner Wenyu Zhu, upon Respondent Donna Campagnolo served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Department of Homeland Security served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; David Lester served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Kevin K. McAleenan served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; United States Citizenship and Immigration Service served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Genoveva Ortega. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hazany, Leon)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Donna Campagnolo, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, David Lester, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service. (jtil)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Wenyu Zhu. (Hazany, Leon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Wenyu Zhu, (Hazany, Leon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Wenyu Zhu. (Hazany, Leon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION Receipt No: 0973-24069800 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Wenyu Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Denial of N-400, #2 Exhibit B: Denial of N-336, #3 Exhibit C: Approval of Removal of Conditions) (Attorney Leon Hazany added to party Wenyu Zhu(pty:pet))(Hazany, Leon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wenyu Zhu v. David Lester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Lester
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Service
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donna Campagnolo
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wenyu Zhu
Represented By: Leon Hazany
Represented By: Jennifer J De La Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?