Ryan S. v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ryan S.
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.,, UHC of California, Optum, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Behavioral Health, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., United Healthcare Services, LLC and United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01363
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE #61 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaintshall be filed no later than October 9, 2020. (See order for further details.) (es)
September 17, 2020 Filing 61 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmer, Andrew)
September 11, 2020 Filing 60 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #29 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition #42 , filed by Plaintiff Ryan S.(Hopkins, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2020 Filing 59 MINUTES OF Telephonic Status Conference on Patent Case held before Judge James V. Selna: Cause is called for hearing and counsel make their appearances. Court and counsel confer. Trial remains set for December 14, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. (See document for details.) Plaintiff has 30 days to amend. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter and vacates the August 17, 2020 hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. (es)
July 31, 2020 Filing 57 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint #53 filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Romano, Jennifer)
July 17, 2020 Filing 56 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint #53 filed by Plaintiff Ryan S.. (Hopkins, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT DATES #54 by Judge James V. Selna. The case management dates set forth in the Court's November 25, 2019, Orders (Dkt. Nos. 36, 37) are continued for 150 days, or as soon thereafter as the Court's schedule permits, resulting in the following tentative case schedule: Court Trial December 14, 2021. Final Pre-Trial Conference November 29, 2021 [note date change] Discovery Cut-Off August 17, 2021. Expert Discovery Cut-Off November 1, 2021. Law and Motion Cut-Off October 25, 2021. Mediation Completion March 15, 2021. Class Certification Motion December 3, 2020. 2. The Status Conference (Dkt. No. 50) currently scheduled for August 17, 2020, remains unchanged. *See document for details.* (es)
June 30, 2020 Filing 54 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Dates and Trial from July 13, 2021 to December 14, 2021 filed by plaintiff Ryan S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eisenbrey, Damon)
June 26, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration Of Ngoc Han S. Nguyen In Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, #3 Declaration Of Andrew Holmer In Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint) (Romano, Jennifer)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER STAYING CASE IN PART #51 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, having considered the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Stay Case In Part, and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: This action is hereby STAYED IN PART *See Document for details.* (es)
June 15, 2020 Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Stay Case in Part filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmer, Andrew)
May 26, 2020 Filing 50 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the Status Conference previously set for 6/1/2020 at 10:30 am is continued to 8/17/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE #48 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 3. Defendants' response to any remaining portions of Plaintiff's SecondAmended Complaint shall be filed no later than June 26, 2020. *SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES.* (es)
April 6, 2020 Filing 48 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Related Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Modifying Schedule)(Holmer, Andrew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Ryan S. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) re plaintiff Raymond H as to All Parties. (Eisenbrey, Damon)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE #45 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs' deadline to file a request for dismissal as to Raymond H. shall be March 27, 2020; 2. The Parties' deadline to file a request for a stipulated stay of any claims asserted by Ryan S. shall be March 27, 2020; *SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND DEADLINES.* (es)
February 24, 2020 Filing 45 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Related Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmer, Andrew)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE, #43 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint shall befiled no later than February 28, 2020; *See order for further details and deadlines.* (es)
January 29, 2020 Filing 43 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Related Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmer, Andrew)
January 20, 2020 Filing 42 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #29 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiffs Ryan S.(Eisenbrey, Damon)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, having been informed by the parties in this action that they submit on the Court's tentative ruling previously issued, hereby rules in accordance with the tentative ruling as follows: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. Ryan S has 21 days to amend his FAC. (See order for additional information) (es)
December 20, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Romano, Jennifer)
December 2, 2019 Filing 39 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Plaintiff Ryan S.. (Eisenbrey, Damon)
December 2, 2019 Filing 38 Opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by Plaintiff Ryan S.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Eisenbrey, Damon)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL; SETTING DATES, PREPARATION FOR COURT TRIAL AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL by Judge James V. Selna, (lc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Courtsets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows:Court Trial July 13, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by July 6, 2021.Final Pre Trial Conference June 28, 2021 at 11:00 a.m.File PreTrial Documents not later than May 31, 2021.File motions in limine not later than June 4, 2021.Discovery Cut-off March 30, 2021.Expert Discovery Cut-off June 4, 2021.Initial disclosure of Experts not later than April 2, 2021.Rebuttal disclosure of Experts not later than May 4, 2021.Law and Motion Cut-off May 24, 2021 at 1 :30 p.m.Motions to be filed and served not later than April 26, 2021.Class Certification Motion July 6, 2020.Status Conference June 1, 2020 at 10:30 a.m.Counsel inform the Court that their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule 16-15 is ADR 3. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than October 20, 2020. Counsel shall file a Joint Report of the parties regarding outcome of settlementdiscussions no later than 7 days after settlement conference. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 18, 2019 Filing 34 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Plaintiff Ryan S... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Presumptive Schedule of Pretrial Dates)(Eisenbrey, Damon)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE HEARING REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #31 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff's opposition to the Motion shall be filed no later than December 2, 2019; 2. Defendants' reply in support of the Motion shall be filed no later than December 20, 2019; and 3. The hearing on Defendants' Motion, currently set for December 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m., shall be continued to January 6, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 10C of the above-captioned Court. (es)
November 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adrian L Canzoneri on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan S. (Attorney Adrian L Canzoneri added to party Ryan S.(pty:pla))(Canzoneri, Adrian)
November 13, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 filed by plaintiff Ryan S.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eisenbrey, Damon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ngoc Han S. Nguyen, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Andrew Holmer, #5 Declaration of April N. Ross, #6 Exhibit C (Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint), #7 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party Optum, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party Optuminsight, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Romano, Jennifer)
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Ryan S.(Collins, Richard)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: re Stipulation for Protective Order #27 . (sbou)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Against Template Protective Order)(Holmer, Andrew)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Stipulation Modifying Scheduing #25 . Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, if at all, on or before 10/11/19; Answer due 10/25/19; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Scheduling Conference continued to 11/25/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (twdb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File response to Complaint, Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 9/30/2019 to 11/25/2019 filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmer, Andrew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,,,, #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel is incomplete and not signed. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mana Elihu Lombardo counsel for Defendants UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. Adding Mana Elihu Lombardo as counsel of record for United Healthgroup, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; United Healthcare Insurance Co.; UHC of California; United Healthcare Services LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants United Healthgroup, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; United Healthcare Insurance Co.; UHC of California; United Healthcare Services LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Attorney Mana Elihu Lombardo added to party UHC of California (pty:dft), Attorney Mana Elihu Lombardo added to party United Behavioral Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mana Elihu Lombardo added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Mana Elihu Lombardo added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mana Elihu Lombardo added to party United Healthcare Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mana Elihu Lombardo added to party UnitedHealth Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lombardo, Mana)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer S Romano counsel for Defendants UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc.. Adding Jennifer S. Romano as counsel of record for United Healthgroup, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; United Healthcare Insurance Co.; UHC of California; United Healthcare Services LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants United Healthgroup, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; United Healthcare Insurance Co.; UHC of California; United Healthcare Services LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party UHC of California (pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party United Behavioral Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party United Healthcare Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S Romano added to party UnitedHealth Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Romano, Jennifer)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/23/2019. (lb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated. (Holmer, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. identifying UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated as Corporate Parent. (Holmer, Andrew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants United Healthcare Services, LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Optum, Inc., UHC of California.(Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party Optum, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party Optuminsight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party UHC of California (pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party United Behavioral Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party United HealthCare Services, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party United Healthcare Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party UnitedHealth Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Holmer, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton to the calendar of Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as SACV19-1363-JVS (KESx). (dv)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Healthcare Services, LLC. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United HealthCare Services, Inc. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Optum, Inc. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Optum Services, Inc. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Optuminsight, Inc. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Behavioral Health, Inc. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UHC of California. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ryan S.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Eisenbrey, Damon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ryan S., (Eisenbrey, Damon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ryan S.. (Eisenbrey, Damon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24071673 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ryan S.. (Attorney Damon D Eisenbrey added to party Ryan S.(pty:pla))(Eisenbrey, Damon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan S. v. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC of California
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, LLC
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mana Elihu Lombardo
Represented By: Jennifer S Romano
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan S.
Represented By: Damon D Eisenbrey
Represented By: Lisa S Kantor
Represented By: Richard T Collins
Represented By: Elizabeth Hopkins
Represented By: Edward Susolik
Represented By: Daniel J Callahan
Represented By: Adrian L Canzoneri
Represented By: Lisa S. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?