Celedonio Aguirre v. Albertsons LLC et al
Plaintiff: Celedonio Aguirre
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive, Albertson's LLC, Albertsons, LLC and Does 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01382
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #13 filed by Plaintiff Celedonio Aguirre. (Smaili, Jihad)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING FOR SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. Order to issue. Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (twdb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Confernece previously scheduled for 9/3/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2019 @ 1:30 PM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Defendant Albertsons, LLC(White, Leigh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Defendant Albertsons, LLC.. (White, Leigh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Albertsons, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on July 17, 2019. (White, Leigh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
July 15, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF CELEDONIO AGUIRRE'S COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Albertsons, LLC. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 .(et)
July 15, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Albertsons, LLC, Does 1-50 Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Celedonio Aguirre. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying Albertson's LLC. (Attorney Leigh A White added to party Does 1-50 inclusive(pty:dft))(White, Leigh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (White, Leigh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County-Central Justice, case number 30-2019-01070260-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24085762 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service (POS)) (Attorney Leigh A White added to party Albertson's LLC(pty:dft))(White, Leigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celedonio Aguirre v. Albertsons LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50 inclusive
Represented By: Leigh A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's LLC
Represented By: Leigh A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons, LLC
Represented By: Leigh A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celedonio Aguirre
Represented By: Jihad M Smaili
Represented By: Adam Obeid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?