Michael J Smith et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Michael J Smith and Debra Smith
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Successor to Bank of America N.A. as Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A. as Trustee for WMALT Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2 Trust, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A. and Does 1-100 inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01408
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., re Response in Support of Motion #27 served on September 16, 2019. (Freed, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #17 filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Freed, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS #17 filed by Plaintiffs Debra Smith, Michael J Smith. (lom)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND #13 filed by Plaintiffs Michael J Smith, Debra Smith. (lom) Modified on 9/13/2019 (lom).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #23 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court GRANTS the Stipulation, as follows: (1) The Scheduling Conference currently set for September 19, 2019, shall be continued to September 30, 2019 at 1:30 p.m., so as to occur at the same time as the previously noticed hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Defendants'Motion to Dismiss. (2) The parties shall file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report on or before September 23, 2019. (lom)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 19, 2019 to September 30, 2019 filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freed, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., re Response in Opposition to Motion #20 , Request for Judicial Notice #21 served on 09/12/2019. (Freed, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #13 filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freed, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #13 filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Freed, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., re Request for Judicial Notice, #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #17 served on 08/23/2019. (Freed, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #17 filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Freed, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Freed, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Debra Smith, Michael J Smith, re Declaration (Motion related) #14 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #15 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #13 served on 8/19/2019. (es)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Debra Smith, Michael J Smith, (es)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Plaintiffs in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to #13 filed by Plaintiffs Debra Smith, Michael J Smith. (es)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case Back to State Court filed by plaintiff Debra Smith, Michael J Smith. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (es)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/12/2019. (lb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #10 served on 07/25/2019. (Freed, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to U.S. Bank, N.A. answer now due 8/23/2019; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer now due 8/23/2019, filed by Defendants U.S. Bank, N.A.; JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Freed, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on 07/23/2019. (Freed, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 served on July 22, 2019. (Freed, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
July 19, 2019 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Michael J Smith, Debra Smith, upon Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 6/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Victor Dominguez, title/relationship unknown, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 3) (esa)
July 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Michael J Smith, Debra Smith. (Filed in state court 6/19/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 7) (esa)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Successor to Bank of America N.A. as Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A. as Trustee for WMALT Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2 Trust (Freed, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Successor to Bank of America N.A. as Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A. as Trustee for WMALT Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2 Trust, (Freed, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Successor to Bank of America N.A. as Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A. as Trustee for WMALT Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2 Trust. (Freed, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01077758 Receipt No: 0973-24116119 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant U.S. Bank, N.A., as Successor to Bank of America N.A. as Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A. as Trustee for WMALT Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2 Trust, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney John D Freed added to party JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,(pty:dft), Attorney John D Freed added to party U.S. Bank, N.A., as Successor to Bank of America N.A. as Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A. as Trustee for WMALT Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2 Trust(pty:dft))(Freed, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael J Smith et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Represented By: John D Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Successor to Bank of America N.A. as Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A. as Trustee for WMALT Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2 Trust
Represented By: John D Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John D Freed
Represented By: Joseph E Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John D Freed
Represented By: Joseph E Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?