Clifford C. Loyer v. City of Cyress et al
Plaintiff: Clifford C. Loyer
Defendant: Matthew Timney, Chief of Police, Randy Eugene Lockridge, Thomas Flores, Gregory Blum, City of Cyress, Christopher James Patapoff, Jonathan Krock, Erik Carlson, Philip Milam, Jill Gassler, Jennifer Breckenridge-Baldwin, Clemons, - and Mark Clemens
Case Number: 8:2019cv01504
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Clifford C. Loyer. (sbou)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees $5.35 with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Clifford C. Loyer. (sbou)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER RE: PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for pretrial proceedings. Except as otherwise specified in paragraph 1 below, all future documents submitted in this case shall be addressed to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, CA 90012-1565. [See document for details.] (et)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: Granting #7 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $5.35 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (et)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Clifford C. Loyer. (sbou)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOCKET NO. [5)] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. On August 19, 2019, plaintiff filed a Motion for Extension of Time ("Plaintiff's Motion") seeking a one-week extension of time to comply with the August 6 Order. Plaintiff's Motion is granted. Plaintiff's deadline to comply with the August 6 Order is extended to August 27, 2019. (See document for details.) (sbou)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Plaintiff Clifford C. Loyer. (sbou)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PAY FILING FEE OR TO SUBMIT IFP REQUEST AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS; AND (2) DEFERRING CONSIDERATION OF MATTER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Plaintiff shall, by not later than August 20, 2019, either pay the full $400 filing fee or complete, sign, and return the Request to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support (Form CV-60P), along with a certified copy of plaintiff's trust account statement for the past six months (or institutional equivalent) and a disbursement notification (See document for details.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (sbou)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Gregory Blum(Police Officer, official capacity), Gregory Blum(individual), Chief of Police(Chief of Police-Cypress Police Department, offical capacity), Chief of Police(individual), City of Cyress, Thomas Flores(individual), Thomas Flores(Police Officer, official capacity), Randy Eugene Lockridge, Matthew Timney, Matthew Timney pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian., filed by plaintiff Clifford C. Loyer. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford C. Loyer v. City of Cyress et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Eugene Lockridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cyress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher James Patapoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Krock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Gassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Breckenridge-Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemons, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Clemens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford C. Loyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?