Paul L. Whittier v. Commissioner for Social Security
Plaintiff: Paula L Whittier
Defendant: Commissioner for Social Security
Case Number: 8:2019cv01521
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner for Social Security. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Commissioner for Social Security(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paula L Whittier, upon Defendant Commissioner for Social Security served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Donaldson, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner for Social Security. (sbou)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Paula L Whittier. (Donaldson, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case is designated for electronic filing. See Local Rule 5-4. When a proposed order or other proposed document is lodged or accompanies a filing, a WordPerfect or Word copy of the proposed order or other proposed document shall also be e-mailed to: JC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. See Local Rule 5- 4.4.2. No other communications should be sent to this e-mail address. (See document for details.) (sbou)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paula L Whittier. (Donaldson, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Paula L Whittier. (Donaldson, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Paula L Whittier. (Attorney Michael D Donaldson added to party Paula L Whittier (pty:pla))(Donaldson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul L. Whittier v. Commissioner for Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula L Whittier
Represented By: Michael D Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner for Social Security
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?