Leonard Galarza v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Leonard Galarza
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2019cv01525
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration (pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leonard Galarza, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 8/12/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. Dela Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (jdo)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (jdo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Leonard Galarza. (Monge, Troy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Leonard J Galarza. (Monge, Troy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Leonard J Galarza. (Monge, Troy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Leonard J Galarza, (Monge, Troy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leonard J Galarza. (Monge, Troy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Leonard J Galarza. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Leonard J Galarza(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard Galarza v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Galarza
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?