Giribala Patel et al v. Citibank Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Giribala Patel and Sajan Patel
Defendant: Citibank Corporation, Apple, Inc., Bank of America, JP Morgan Chase Corporation, Lynda Kathlyn Comaduran, Subhankar Bose, Regions Financial Corporation, Does 1 -100, FedEx Corporation, Google, LLC, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as "JPMorgan Chase & Corporation) and Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01539
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 50 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS CITIBANK, N.A. #15 , APPLE INC. #20 , GOOGLE LLC #24 , REGIONS FINANCIAL CORPORATION #25 , AND BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. #31 . Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, if so desired, by October 11, 2019. The Scheduling Conference is rescheduled to November 4, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (twdb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 49 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Scheduling Conference not held. Court to issue an order re Motions to Dismiss #15 , #20 , #24 , #25 , #31 . Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Uribe; Defendant Attorney: David Michael Chute, Matthew J. Esposito, Cindy Mekari Rucker, Gregory Haviland Smith, Kevin L. Vick; Time in Court: :01. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
September 25, 2019 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT and Notice Re Availability filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as "JPMorgan Chase & Corporation). (Bohmholdt, Karin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jarrod Yutaka Nakano counsel for Plaintiffs Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel. Mario M Oropeza is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Giribala Patel and Sajan Patel. (Nakano, Jarrod)
September 23, 2019 Filing 46 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Held and continued. Scheduling Conference continued to 9/27/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: CourtSmart; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Uribe; Defendant Attorney: David Michael Chute, Matthew J. Esposito, Karin Bohmholdt, Cindy Mekari Rucker, Gregory Haviland Smith, Jean-Paul Jassy, Kevin L. Vick, Craig Edward Lindberg, Thomas W. Murrey, Jr.; Time in Court: :20. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jarrod Yutaka Nakano on behalf of Plaintiffs Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel (Nakano, Jarrod)
September 18, 2019 Filing 44 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #24 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Declaration of David M. Chute #15 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #31 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #25 . The Court finds these matters appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearings set for 9/30/2019 are removed from the calendar and the motions are taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 16, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #24 filed by Defendant Google, LLC. (Vick, Kevin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Gregory)
September 16, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Declaration of David M. Chute #15 filed by Defendant Citibank Corporation. (Chute, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #25 filed by Defendant Regions Financial Corporation. (Rucker, Cindy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #31 filed by Defendant Bank of America. (Esposito, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 38 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 Days, filed by Plaintiffs Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nakano, Jarrod)
September 9, 2019 Filing 37 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 Days, filed by Plaintiffs Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel.. (Nakano, Jarrod)
September 9, 2019 Filing 36 Opposition Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #31 filed by Plaintiffs Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel. (Nakano, Jarrod)
September 9, 2019 Filing 35 Opposition Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Plaintiffs Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel. (Nakano, Jarrod)
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 Opposition Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Declaration of David M. Chute #15 filed by Plaintiffs Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel. (Nakano, Jarrod)
September 9, 2019 Filing 33 Opposition Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #24 filed by Plaintiffs Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel. (Nakano, Jarrod)
August 29, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bank of America, identifying Bank of America, N.A.. (Esposito, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bank of America. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Esposito, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Thomas W. Murrey, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (erroneously sued as Fedex Corporation), Defendant, designating Craig E. Lindberg as local counsel. (twdb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as "JPMorgan Chase & Corporation), identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Karin Bohmholdt added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as "JPMorgan Chase & Corporation)(pty:dft))(Bohmholdt, Karin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas W. Murrey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Federal Express Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24336368) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas W. Murrey, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Federal Express Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24336368) filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lindberg, Craig)
August 23, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Regions Financial Corporation, (Rucker, Cindy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Regions Financial Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Rucker, Cindy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Google, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Vick, Kevin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 . The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 9/16/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 [PROPOSED] ORDER re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Gregory)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Smith, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motion to dismiss. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion hearing was not set. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Apple, Inc., identifying Apple Inc.. (Attorney Gregory Haviland Smith added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, Gregory)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Gregory H. Smith In Support of Motionn to Dismiss)(Smith, Gregory)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Citibank Corporation, (Chute, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Declaration of David M. Chute filed by defendant Citibank Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney David Michael Chute added to party Citibank Corporation(pty:dft)) (Chute, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Regions Financial Corporation answer now due 8/23/2019, filed by Defendant Regions Financial Corporation.(Attorney Cindy Mekari Rucker added to party Regions Financial Corporation(pty:dft))(Rucker, Cindy)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #8 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Document #6, page 16 is missing a signature. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Google, LLC, identifying Giribala Patel, Sajan Patel, FedEx Corporation, Citibank Corporation, Bank of America, JP Morgan Chase & Corporation, Regions Financial Corporation, Apple, Inc., Google LLC, XXVI Holdings Inc., Alphabet Inc., Lynda Kathlyn Comaduran, and Subhankar Bose. (Vick, Kevin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Google, LLC answer now due 8/23/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Google, LLC.(Attorney Kevin L Vick added to party Google, LLC(pty:dft))(Vick, Kevin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Corporation.(Attorney Karin Bohmholdt added to party JP Morgan Chase Corporation(pty:dft))(Bohmholdt, Karin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bank of America answer now due 9/9/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Bank of America.(Attorney Matthew J Esposito added to party Bank of America(pty:dft))(Esposito, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation.(Lindberg, Craig)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Declaration, #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Disclosure Statement, No.3 Certification as to Interested Parties, and No. 4 Notice of No Related Cases should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 2. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
August 8, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Apple, Inc., Bank of America, Citibank Corporation, Does, Federal Express Corporation, Google, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Corporation, Lynda Kathlyn Comaduran, Regions Financial Corporation, Subhankar Bose. Filed by Plaintiffs Sajan Patel, Giribala Patel. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/06/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Craig E. Lindberg re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FedEx Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Interested Parties, #4 Notice of No Related Cases)(Lindberg, Craig)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2019-01075193 Receipt No: 0973-24230695 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FedEx Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Attorney Craig Edward Lindberg added to party FedEx Corporation(pty:dft))(Lindberg, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giribala Patel et al v. Citibank Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank Corporation
Represented By: Stuart B Wolfe
Represented By: David Michael Chute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Haviland Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Matthew J Esposito
Represented By: Austin Benjamin Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Corporation
Represented By: Karin Bohmholdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Kathlyn Comaduran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subhankar Bose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation
Represented By: Cindy Mekari Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 -100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Corporation
Represented By: Craig Edward Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Jean-Paul Jassy
Represented By: Kevin L Vick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (erroneously sued as "JPMorgan Chase & Corporation)
Represented By: Karin Bohmholdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Craig Edward Lindberg
Represented By: Thomas W Murrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giribala Patel
Represented By: Timothy George McFarlin
Represented By: Mario M Oropeza
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Uribe
Represented By: Jarrod Yutaka Nakano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sajan Patel
Represented By: Timothy George McFarlin
Represented By: Mario M Oropeza
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Uribe
Represented By: Jarrod Yutaka Nakano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?